EP3689869 - HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND AND ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LT Materials Co., Ltd. Namsa-Meyon 113-19, Dangha-ro Cheoin-gu, Gyeonggi-do Yongin-City 17118 / KR | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Gi-Back 302 57 Uncheon-ro 165beon-gil Osan-si Gyeonggi-do 18134 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Seong-Jong 502 31-1 Wondong-ro 7beon-gil Osan-si Gyeonggi-do 18141 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Ji-Young 905 29 Dongbaek 3-ro 11beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17006 / KR | 04 /
JEONG, Won-Jang 314-1704 10 Wau-ro 15beon-gil Bongdam-eup Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18321 / KR | 05 /
CHOI, Jin-Seok 123-1201 30 Hwayang-ro 50beon-gil Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16438 / KR | 06 /
CHOI, Dae-Hyuk 703-1302 126 Heungdeok 2-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16953 / KR | 07 /
LEE, Joo-Dong 207-1003 7 Dolma-ro 486beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13586 / KR | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 18861210.5 | 01.10.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018KR11624 | Priority number, date | KR20170127755 | 29.09.2017 Original published format: KR 20170127755 | [2020/32] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019066607 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3689869 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D403/14, H01L51/00, H01L51/50, C09K11/00 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR);
C07D403/14 (KR,US);
C07D403/04 (US);
C07D407/14 (US);
C07D409/14 (US);
C09K11/06 (EP);
H10K50/13 (EP,KR);
H10K50/16 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/622 (US);
H10K85/654 (US);
H10K85/657 (KR);
H10K85/6572 (EP,KR);
H10K85/6574 (US);
H10K30/353 (US);
H10K50/171 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/32] | C07D471/04, C07D403/14, H01L51/00, H01L51/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | HETEROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNG UND ORGANISCHE LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2020/32] | English: | HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND AND ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE COMPRISING SAME | [2020/32] | French: | COMPOSÉ HÉTÉROCYCLIQUE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2020 | Translation filed | 18.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 14.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2014112728 (HEESUNG MAT LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]JP2010215759 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC); | [A]CN101870697 (UNIV FUDAN); | [A]KR20110023090 (SAMSUNG MOBILE DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [X]KR20140093163 (HEESUNG MAT LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20150028173 (HEESUNG MAT LTD [KR]); | [X]KR20170053534 (HEESUNG MAT LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US4356429 | KR20170127755 |