EP3690073 - OIL WELL PIPE MARTENSITIC STAINLESS SEAMLESS STEEL PIPE AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDO Mami c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
KAMO Yuichi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 03 /
YUGA Masao c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 18861269.1 | 04.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018JP32685 | Priority number, date | JP20170190075 | 29.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017190075 | [2020/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019065115 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3690073 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C22C38/44, C22C38/46, C22C38/50, C22C38/42, C22C38/52, C22C38/48, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/54, C21D9/08, C21D1/22, C21D8/10 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
C21D1/22 (EP,US);
C21D9/085 (EP,US);
C21D8/10 (EP);
C21D8/105 (EP,US);
C21D9/08 (EP);
C22C38/00 (EP);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/005 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/42 (EP,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,US);
C22C38/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/48 (EP,US);
C22C38/50 (EP,US);
C22C38/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | NAHTLOSES ROHR AUS MARTENSITISCHEM EDELSTAHL FÜR ÖLBOHRLOCH UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/32] | English: | OIL WELL PIPE MARTENSITIC STAINLESS SEAMLESS STEEL PIPE AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR SAME | [2020/32] | French: | TUYAU SANS SOUDURE EN ACIER INOXYDABLE À BASE DE MARTENSITE POUR TUBAGE DE PUITS DE PÉTROLE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2020 | Translation filed | 11.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 15.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2001026820 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [I] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1143024 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-4 * * tables 1-2 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0029] *; | [A]US2003217789 (YOSHIZAWA MITSURU [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-21 * * paragraphs [0050] - [0113] * * tables 1-3 *; | [A]JP2004091812 (JFE STEEL KK) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009017238 (MIYATA YUKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0023] - [0084] * * tables 1-2 ** claims 1-20 * | International search | [A]JP2010242163 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-4 * , *; | [A]JP2017510715 [A] 1-4 * , *; | [PA]WO2017200083 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-4; | [PA]WO2018079111 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP])[PA] 1-4 | by applicant | WO2004057050 | WO2008023702 | JP2010242163 |