EP3690311 - LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzhou Opple Lighting Co., Ltd. Fenyang Road East Fen Lake Developing Zone Wujiang District Suzhou, Jiangsu 215211 / CN | For all designated states Opple Lighting Co., Ltd. Room 411 Building 1 No. 6111 Longdong Avenue Pudong New District Shanghai 201201 / CN | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Chaobo R&D Building A of Opple Lighting Fenyang Road Fen Lake Developing Zone Wujiang District Suzhou Jiangsu 215211 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Hongbo R&D Building A of Opple Lighting Fenyang Road Fen Lake Developing Zone Wujiang District Suzhou Jiangsu 215211 / CN | 03 /
WEI, Qingjun R&D Building A of Opple Lighting Fenyang Road Fen Lake Developing Zone Wujiang District Suzhou Jiangsu 215211 / CN | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 18862283.1 | 25.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018CN107376 | Priority number, date | CN201710897781 | 28.09.2017 Original published format: CN201710897781 | CN201710900652 | 28.09.2017 Original published format: CN201710900652 | CN201721258961U | 28.09.2017 Original published format: CN 201721258961 U | CN201721265861U | 28.09.2017 Original published format: CN 201721265861 U | [2020/32] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019062718 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3690311 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F21V3/02, F21V5/04, F21W131/103, F21S8/08, F21V5/00, F21V5/08 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
F21V5/007 (EP,US);
F21S8/085 (US);
F21S8/086 (EP);
F21V3/02 (EP);
F21V3/10 (US);
F21V5/04 (EP,US);
F21V5/08 (EP);
G02B19/0014 (EP);
G02B19/0061 (EP);
G02B27/0955 (EP);
F21V29/70 (US);
F21W2131/103 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/32] | F21V3/02, F21V5/04, F21W131/103 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/32] | English: | LIGHTING DEVICE | [2020/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2020 | Translation filed | 24.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 07.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9426079 (BLAKE FREDERICK H [US]); | [Y]US6784357 (WANG CHAO HSIANG [TW]); | [Y]US2008068799 (CHAN TSUNG-WEN [TW]); | [Y]US2009046460 (LI XULIANG [CN]); | [Y]WO2009026736 (HE SHAN LIDE ELECTRONIC ENTPR [CN], et al); | [XYI]US2011068708 (COPLIN BARRY CASON [US], et al); | [Y]US2011320024 (LIN LUNG-SHENG [TW], et al); | [Y]US2012050889 (LU MU-YIN [TW], et al); | [Y]JP2015090772 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP); | [Y]US2016201876 (LV GUOFENG [CN], et al) |