EP3687868 - VEHICLE IMMOBILIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Griffen Security LLC 6665 NW 42 Way Boca Raton, Florida 33496 / US | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILDING, Gavin c/o Griffen Security LLC 6665 NW 42 Way Boca Raton, Florida 33496 / US | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 18862656.8 | 24.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018US52383 | Priority number, date | US201762564747P | 28.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762564747 P | US201816130519 | 13.09.2018 Original published format: US201816130519 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019067345 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3687868 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/24, B60R25/10, B60R25/04, B60R25/20 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
G06K7/10366 (EP,US);
B60R25/2036 (EP);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US);
G06K7/0008 (US);
H04W4/80 (US);
B60R25/04 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/32] | B60R25/24, B60R25/10, B60R25/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGWEGFAHRSPERRE | [2020/32] | English: | VEHICLE IMMOBILIZER | [2020/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMMOBILISATION DE VÉHICULE | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 15.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/35] | 26.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005007243 (EMMERLING ULRICH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 17] , [0 48] , [0 51] , [0 66] - [0070]; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2006084330 (OMNIKEY PTY LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 7, lines 10--12; figures 1-3,5,11; claims 1-11 *; | [Y]WO2013034556 (LAND ROVER UK LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 18, paragraph 2 - page 21, paragraph 1; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]US6898489 (HAYES SR DOYLE A [US]) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US2013063244 (RAED MUHAMMAD WASIM [SA], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [Y]US6191703 (WALLACE MARK D [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 8, line 5 - column 10, line 33; figures 1-8 * | International search | [XY]KR20100073586 (HYUN DAI HEAVY IND CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3, 10, 12, 16-18 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0058] and figures 1-3. * [Y] 4-9, 11, 13-15, 19, 20; | [Y]US6898489 (HAYES SR DOYLE A [US]) [Y] 4-6, 13, 19, 20 * See column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 63 and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]US2012306636 (TIEMAN CRAIG A [US], et al) [Y] 7-9, 14, 15 * See paragraphs [0010]-[0018] and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2013063244 (RAED MUHAMMAD WASIM [SA], et al) [Y] 11 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0021], claim 1, and figures 1, 2. *; | [A]US2015070135 (FORD GARY [GB]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0110]-[0129] and figures 1, 5-8. * |