EP3688044 - POLYMERS OF HALOALKYL AND HALOALKENYL ETHER (METH)ACRYLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema Inc. 900 First Avenue King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Benjamin Bin 3 Berkshire Terrace Wayne, Pennsylvania 19087 / US | 02 /
POLSZ, Craig Alan 8 Prince Phillip Court Newtown, Pennsylvania 18940 / US | 03 /
CLARKSON, Lucy 2 Balmoral Drive ChaddsFord, Pennsylvania 19317 / US | 04 /
WANG, Jing-Han (Helen) 912 Ashford Lane Blue Bell, Pennsylvania 19422 / US | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | Leca, François Michel ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 18863618.7 | 25.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018US52572 | Priority number, date | US201762563753P | 27.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762563753 P | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019067408 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3688044 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08F20/06, C08F114/18, C08F220/06, D06M15/21, D06M15/263, D06M15/277, C08F120/24, C09D133/16, C07C57/52, C07C67/29, C07C69/653 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
C08F220/14 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08F214/245 (EP,CN,KR);
C08F220/24 (KR,US);
C07C67/29 (EP);
C07C69/653 (EP);
C08F120/24 (EP,CN);
C08F220/22 (EP,KR,US);
C09D133/16 (EP,US);
D06M15/256 (CN);
D06M15/263 (EP,CN);
D06M15/277 (EP,CN);
C08F220/20 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C07C67/29, C07C69/653 (EP);
C08F220/14, C08F220/24 (CN,EP,US) |
Former IPC [2020/32] | C08F20/06, C08F114/18, C08F220/06, D06M15/21, D06M15/263, D06M15/277 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | POLYMERE VON HALOGENALKYL- UND HALOGENALKENYLETHER(METH)ACRYLATEN | [2020/32] | English: | POLYMERS OF HALOALKYL AND HALOALKENYL ETHER (METH)ACRYLATES | [2020/32] | French: | POLYMÈRES DE (MÉTH)ACRYLATES D'ÉTHER D'HALOALKYLE ET D'HALOALCÉNYLE | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 13.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3514487 (ANELLO LOUIS G, et al); | [XI]US4039735 (HRABAK FRANTISEK, et al); | [XI]JPH0497117 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | International search | [A]US2001007889 (ARAKI TAKAYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2016178813 (LIAO HAO-WEI [TW], et al); |