EP3748418 - GRATING DRIVE CIRCUIT, DRIVE METHOD, AND AUTOSTERESCOPIC 3D DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO., LTD. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Ming No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Xiaochuan No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
ZHAO, Wenqing No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Chen-Yu No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 05 /
ZHU, Jinye No.9 Dize Road BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Huyssenallee 68 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/50] | Gesthuysen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 18863814.2 | 07.09.2018 | [2020/50] | WO2018CN104548 | Priority number, date | CN20181089682 | 30.01.2018 Original published format: CN201810089682 | [2020/50] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019148842 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3748418 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.08.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/31, H04N13/376, G02B30/31, G02B27/00, G02F1/29 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
G02F1/292 (EP,US);
G02B30/31 (EP,US);
G02B30/40 (US);
G06F3/013 (US);
H04N13/31 (EP);
H04N13/376 (EP);
G02B27/0093 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/35] | G02B30/31, G02B27/00, G02F1/29, G02B27/01, G06F3/01, G02B30/27 | ||
Former IPC [2020/50] | G02B27/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | GITTERTREIBERSCHALTUNG, ANSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND AUTOSTEREOSKOPISCHE 3D-ANZEIGE | [2020/50] | English: | GRATING DRIVE CIRCUIT, DRIVE METHOD, AND AUTOSTERESCOPIC 3D DISPLAY | [2020/50] | French: | CIRCUIT D'ATTAQUE DE RÉSEAU, PROCÉDÉ D'ATTAQUE, ET AFFICHEUR 3D AUTOSTÉRÉOSCOPIQUE | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2019 | Translation filed | 12.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2019 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 28.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN102572483 (SHENZHEN SUPER PERFECT OPTOELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [YA]US2014009590 (JIANG TAIPING [CN], et al); | [XYI]CN106918956 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al); | [A]CN107229131 (SHENZHEN CHINA STAR OPTOELECT); | US2019353915 [ ] (ZHANG ZIJING [CN], et al) |