EP3693109 - SILVER MICROPARTICLE DISPERSION LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dowa Electronics Materials Co., Ltd. 14-1 Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERAGAWA Shingo C/O DOWA ELECTRONICS MATERIALS CO. LTD. 14-1 Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | 02 /
HINOTSU Takashi C/O DOWA ELECTRONICS MATERIALS CO. LTD. 14-1 Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | 03 /
HUI Dave 6 Long Wood Road Stoke Gifford Bristol BS16 1FD / GB | 04 /
WOLFE Michael Stephen 112 School Rd Wilmington Delaware 19803 / US | 05 /
GLICKSMAN Howard David 4106 Colville Road Durham North Carolina 27707 / US | 06 /
YANG Haixin 104 Sagerview Way Durham North Carolina 27713 / US | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 18863873.8 | 02.10.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018JP36905 | Priority number, date | US201715724378 | 04.10.2017 Original published format: US201715724378 | [2020/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019069936 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3693109 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B22F9/00, B22F1/00, B22F1/02, B22F9/24, H01B1/22, C08K9/04, C09D101/28, // C08K3/08 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
B22F9/24 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/0545 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/28 (US);
C08K9/08 (KR);
C08L1/28 (KR);
C08L1/284 (KR);
C09D101/28 (EP,US);
C09D101/284 (EP,US);
H01B1/22 (EP,KR);
C08K2003/0806 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2201/001 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2201/003 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/33] | B22F9/00, B22F1/00, B22F1/02, B22F9/24, H01B1/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | SILBER-MIKROPARTIKEL-DISPERSIONSFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2020/33] | English: | SILVER MICROPARTICLE DISPERSION LIQUID | [2020/33] | French: | DISPERSION LIQUIDE DE MICROPARTICULES D'ARGENT | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2020 | Translation filed | 26.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 15.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2014318618 (PAIK CHOONG-HOON [KR], et al); | [X]WO2015151941 (DAICEL CORP [JP]); | [X]WO2016132649 (DAICEL CORP [JP]) | International search | [XA]US2014318618 (PAIK CHOONG-HOON [KR], et al); | [X]WO2017033911 (TANAKA PRECIOUS METAL IND [JP]); | [PXPA]JP2018060941 (DUPONT ELECTRONICS MAT CO LTD) | by applicant | US2016297982 |