EP3682597 - MODELING ACCESS NETWORKS AS TREES IN SOFTWARE-DEFINED NETWORK CONTROLLERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Jingjing Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WEI, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
QIAN, Liurong Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/44] |
Former [2020/43] | 01 /
ZHANG, Jingjing Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
WEI, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
QIAN, Liurong 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano Texas 75024 / US | |||
Former [2020/39] | 01 /
ZHANG, Jingjing Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
WEI, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / US | |||
03 /
QIAN, Liurong 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano Texas 75024 / US | |||
Former [2020/30] | 01 /
ZHANG, Jingjing 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano Texas 75024 / US | ||
02 /
WEI, Wei 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano Texas 75024 / US | |||
03 /
QIAN, Liurong 5340 Legacy Drive Suite 175 Plano Texas 75024 / US | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/30] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18863972.8 | 27.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018CN107786 | Priority number, date | US201715725035 | 04.10.2017 Original published format: US201715725035 | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019068247 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3682597 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3682597 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L41/0806, H04L41/14, H04L41/122, H04L41/40, H04L41/0895 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H04L41/145 (EP,US);
H04L41/0806 (EP,US);
H04L41/0895 (EP);
H04L41/12 (US);
H04L41/122 (EP);
H04L41/20 (US);
H04L41/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/30] | H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODELLIERUNG VON ZUGANGSNETZEN ALS BÄUME BEI SOFTWAREDEFINIERTEN NETZWERKSTEUERUNGEN | [2020/30] | English: | MODELING ACCESS NETWORKS AS TREES IN SOFTWARE-DEFINED NETWORK CONTROLLERS | [2020/30] | French: | MODÉLISATION DE RÉSEAUX D'ACCÈS EN TANT QU'ARBORESCENCES DANS DES CONTRÔLEURS DE RÉSEAU DÉFINIS PAR LOGICIEL | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 13.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.12.2022 | AT | 21.12.2022 | CZ | 21.12.2022 | DK | 21.12.2022 | EE | 21.12.2022 | ES | 21.12.2022 | FI | 21.12.2022 | HR | 21.12.2022 | IT | 21.12.2022 | LT | 21.12.2022 | LV | 21.12.2022 | MC | 21.12.2022 | NL | 21.12.2022 | PL | 21.12.2022 | RO | 21.12.2022 | RS | 21.12.2022 | SE | 21.12.2022 | SI | 21.12.2022 | SK | 21.12.2022 | SM | 21.12.2022 | NO | 21.03.2023 | GR | 22.03.2023 | IS | 21.04.2023 | PT | 21.04.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
IT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 21.12.2022 | |
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 21.12.2022 | |
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 21.12.2022 | |
NO | 21.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015030328 (FUKUDA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0104]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2015163151 (LI MING [CN]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0029] - [0042]; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]GB2538987 (POLEWARDSKY LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0080]; figure -; claim - *; | [XY] - ZHENG Z FAN HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES A SHARMA GOOGLE X LIU JABIL S BELOTTI NOKIA Y XU CAICT L WANG CHINA MOBILE O GONZALEZ DE DIOS TELE, "A YANG Data Model for Optical Transport Network Topology; draft-ietf-ccamp-otn-topo-yang-01.txt", A YANG DATA MODEL FOR OPTICAL TRANSPORT NETWORK TOPOLOGY; DRAFT-IETF-CCAMP-OTN-TOPO-YANG-01.TXT; INTERNET-DRAFT: CCAMP WORKING GROUP, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GE, (20170914), no. 1, pages 1 - 15, XP015121797 [X] 1,14,15 * the whole document * [Y] 2-13 |