EP3765538 - RUBBER COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING TACKIFIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bakelite UK Holding Ltd. Bakelite Synthetics Sully Moors Road, Sully Penarth CF64 5YU / GB | [2022/19] |
Former [2021/03] | For all designated states Hexion Research Belgium SA Avenue Jean Monnet 1 1348 Ottignies-Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REDDY, Ashok Hexion Inc. 6200 Campgroun Rd. Louisville, KY 41216 / US | 02 /
ZIRKLE, Craig Hexion Inc. 6200 Campground Rd. Lousvile, KY 40216 / US | 03 /
WILLMAN, Justyne Hexion Inc. 6200 Campground Rd. Louisville, KY 40216 / US | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Palinsky, Kathrin Bakelite GmbH Patentabteilung Gennaer Str. 2-4 58642 Iserlohn-Letmathe / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 18864275.5 | 05.10.2018 | [2021/03] | WO2018US54596 | Priority number, date | US201715727329 | 06.10.2017 Original published format: US201715727329 | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019071117 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3765538 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08G8/04, C08G8/10, B60C1/00, C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08L61/06 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
B60C1/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L21/00 (KR);
C08L61/06 (EP,KR,US);
B60C1/0016 (EP,KR,US);
B60C1/0025 (EP,KR,US);
C08G8/04 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/03] | C08G8/04, C08G8/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKMISCHUNGEN MIT KLEBRIGMACHERN | [2021/03] | English: | RUBBER COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING TACKIFIERS | [2021/03] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE CAOUTCHOUC CONTENANT DES AGENTS COLLANTS | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/03] | 01.07.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 02.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2021/03] | 05.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 12.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 12.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 12.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 12.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Date: | 20.10.2022 | ID: | 02 | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Date: | 12.12.2022 | [2023/04] |
Former [2022/52] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 20.10.2022 | ||
[2023/04] | Cited in | International search | [X]GB790644 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO) [X] 1-4, 15 * , pg 1 In 11-37, pg 1 In 48-59, pg 2 In 23-28, pg 2 In 119-128, pg 3 In 8-11, pg 3 In 74-75. *; | [Y]US3708554 (OGURI H, et al) [Y] 9, 14, 19 * , col 1 In 2-3, col 1 In 13-14, col 1 In 53-67, col 4 In 1-4. *; | [Y]US4740424 (SCHUMACHER GERALD F [US], et al) [Y] 9, 19* , col 1 In 60-68, col 2 In 1-4, col 5 In 51-58. *; | [XY]US2004162391 (DURAIRAJ RAJ [US], et al) [X] 1, 5-8, 10-13, 16-18, 20- 21 * , figures 1-2; Table 2; para [0009], [0015],[0030], [0035], [0048], [0053], [0055], [0057]. * [Y] 9, 14, 19 | by applicant | US2017121443 |