EP3692915 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWASHITA, Atsushi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
TSUKUDA, Akira c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
TERUI, Kosuke c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 04 /
TORII, Sota c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 18864534.5 | 11.07.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018JP26121 | Priority number, date | JP20170196397 | 06.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017196397 | [2020/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019069522 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3692915 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, G01V5/00, H04N5/32 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
A61B6/4241 (EP,US);
A61B6/00 (EP);
A61B6/4035 (US);
A61B6/4233 (EP);
A61B6/482 (EP,US);
A61B6/5211 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/33] | A61B6/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2020/33] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2020/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, ET PROGRAMME | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2020 | Translation filed | 11.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 01.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4029963 (ALVAREZ ROBERT E, et al); | [XA]US2006109949 (TKACZYK J E [US], et al); | [X]US2007237288 (TKACZYK J E [US], et al) | International search | [Y]JPH0341933 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH05237081 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [YA]JP2008272476 (SIEMENS AG); | [Y]WO2009107770 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2012125409 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [XY]JP2012245142 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [Y]JP2014166351 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2014239840 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) | by applicant | JPH0876302 | JP2017196397 |