EP3691573 - INTRABODY OSTEOTOMY IMPLANT AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc. 2500 Silveus Crossing Warsaw, IN 46582 / US | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALLARD, Rodney Ray 4276 Chalmette Drive Lakeland, Tennessee 38002 / US | 02 /
MIRE, David A. 3072 Green Fairway Cove S Collierville, Tennessee 38017 / US | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 18864791.1 | 28.09.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018US53274 | Priority number, date | US201715727086 | 06.10.2017 Original published format: US201715727086 | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019070510 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3691573 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70, A61B17/80, A61F2/30, A61F2/44, A61F2/46 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
A61B17/7032 (EP,US);
A61F2/44 (US);
A61B17/7001 (US);
A61B17/708 (US);
A61B17/7083 (US);
A61B17/7085 (US);
A61B17/8095 (EP,US);
A61F2/30 (US);
A61F2/30767 (US);
A61F2/4465 (EP);
A61F2002/30032 (EP);
A61F2002/3023 (EP);
A61F2002/30266 (EP);
A61F2002/30593 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30836 (EP);
A61F2002/3093 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4629 (EP);
A61F2210/0014 (US);
A61F2220/0016 (US);
A61F2230/0015 (US);
A61F2310/00017 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00023 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00029 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00293 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/33] | A61F2/44, A61B17/70, A61F2/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | INTRAKORPORALES OSTEOTOMIEIMPLANTAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2020/33] | English: | INTRABODY OSTEOTOMY IMPLANT AND METHODS OF USE | [2020/33] | French: | IMPLANT D'OSTÉOTOMIE INTRACORPOREL ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 10.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/24] | 31.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015088256 (BALLARD RODNEY [US]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2001029375 (BETZ RANDALL [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0098] * * figures 2, 9, 13 * [I] 4,5; | [XI]US2008154375 (SERHAN HASSAN A [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062] * * figures 2A, 3, 4A, 8 * [I] 4,5; | [XI]EP1523963 (CO LIGNE AG [CH]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025] * * figures 1-6 * [I] 4,5 |