EP3693499 - BRAID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUSUDO, Kazumasa c/o KURARAY CO. LTD. 2-1 Kaigan-dori 1-chome Minami-ku Okayama-shi Okayama 702-8601 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Toshiaki c/o KURARAY CO. LTD. 2-1 Kaigan-dori 1-chome Minami-ku Okayama-shi Okayama 702-8601 / JP | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 18864845.5 | 28.09.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018JP36355 | Priority number, date | JP20170196331 | 06.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017196331 | [2020/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019069817 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3693499 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D04C1/02, D04C1/12, D02G3/22 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
D04C1/02 (EP,US);
D04C1/12 (EP,US);
D02G3/22 (EP);
D10B2401/063 (EP);
D10B2403/0241 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/33] | D04C1/02, D04C1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | GEFLECHT | [2020/33] | English: | BRAID | [2020/33] | French: | TRESSE | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2020 | Translation filed | 19.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 20.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JPH04300350 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO, et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,10,12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0009] , [0025] , [0027]; examples 1, 3 * [A] 11 [I] 2,5,6,8; | [A]US5314446 (HUNTER ALASTAIR W [US], et al) [A] 5* column 4, lines 41-54 *; | [A]JPH07278992 (TEIJIN LTD) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005]; claim 1 *; | [XAI]JP3251437B (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1,9-12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0019] , [0021]; examples 1,3 * [A] 3,4,7 [I] 2,5,6,8; | [A]JP2016069742 (SUNLINE CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] - [0020] - [0023] - [0033] , [0 35] , [0000] , [0042]; figures 1,6 * | International search | [A]JPS5327390B (HAYAMI INDUSTRY CO., LTD.) [A] 1-12 * , claims, examples & JP 51-26363 A *; | [Y]JPH07278992 (TEIJIN LTD) [Y] 1-12 * , claims, paragraph [0008], examples (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH08109533 (TEIJIN LTD) [Y] 1-12 * , claims, paragraph [0008] (Family: none) *; | [A]US2013205979 (NELIS MISCHA [NL], et al) [A] 1-12* , claims, examples & JP 2013-530314 A & US 2015/0267326 A1 & WO 2011/135082 A1 & EP 2563417 A1 & CN 102869388 A & CN 105019088 A * | by applicant | JP5794354B | JP2017196331 |