EP3693411 - FLUORINE-CONTAINING COPOLYMER COMPOSITION AND METAL-RUBBER LAYERED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC Inc. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAGI, Keisuke c/o AGC Inc. 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 18864867.9 | 04.10.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018JP37277 | Priority number, date | JP20170196075 | 06.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017196075 | [2020/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019070040 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3693411 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08L27/12, B32B15/06, B32B15/082, C08K3/22, C08K3/34, C08K3/36, C08L27/18, C08L27/20, C08K5/14, C09D127/12, B32B7/12, B32B15/20, B32B25/02, C08K13/02, B32B15/18 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
B32B7/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08L27/12 (KR);
C08K3/36 (EP,KR,US);
B32B15/06 (EP,US);
B32B15/08 (KR);
B32B15/18 (EP);
B32B15/20 (EP);
B32B25/02 (EP);
B32B27/18 (KR);
C08F214/267 (US);
C08K13/02 (EP);
C08K3/22 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/34 (KR);
C08K5/14 (EP,KR);
C08L27/18 (KR);
C08L27/20 (KR);
C09D127/12 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (EP);
B32B2264/108 (EP);
B32B2307/536 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2327/12 (KR);
C08F2800/10 (US);
C08K2003/222 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K13/02, C08L27/18 (EP);
C08K3/22, C08L27/18 (EP);
C08K3/36, C08L27/18 (EP);
C08K5/14, C08L27/18 (EP); |
Former IPC [2020/33] | C08L27/12, B32B15/06, B32B15/082, C08K3/22, C08K3/34, C08K3/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | FLUORHALTIGE COPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND METALL-KAUTSCHUK-SCHICHTKÖRPER | [2020/33] | English: | FLUORINE-CONTAINING COPOLYMER COMPOSITION AND METAL-RUBBER LAYERED BODY | [2020/33] | French: | COMPOSITION DE COPOLYMÈRE FLUORÉ, ET STRATIFIÉ CAOUTCHOUC-MÉTAL | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2020 | Translation filed | 26.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 14.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2001000788 (ONO SHIGEYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2016024938 (AGC CHEMICALS AMERICAS INC [US]); | International search | [A]JP2002293950 (NICHIAS CORP) [A] 1-13 * , *; | [XYA]JP2007246619 (KURABE IND CO LTD) [X] 1-6, 8 * , * [Y] 7, 9 [A] 10-13; | [Y]WO2009119202 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * , [0 0 3 9] & US 2011/0015342 A1, [0073] & EP 2258733 A1 & CN 101981067 A *; | [Y]WO2010082633 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * , [0 0 3 8] & US 2012/0190796 A1, [0095], [0096] & EP 2383302 A1 & CN 102300886 A & KR 10-2011-0110181 A *; | [Y]JP2014118536 (MITSUBISHI CABLE IND LTD) [Y] 1-13 * , *; | [A]JP2016014092 (NOK CORP) [A] 1-13* , * | by applicant | US4035565 | JPH06306180 | WO2009119202 | WO2010082633 | JP2010235906 | JP2010235907 | WO2014084082 | WO2017057512 | JP2017196075 |