EP3692017 - SULFUR-CONTAINING COMPOUNDS AND POLYMERS AND THE USE THEREOF IN ELECTROCHEMICAL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydro-Québec 75 Boulevard René-Lévesque Ouest Montréal, QC H2Z 1A4 / CA | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÉVESQUE-BÉLANGER, Rachel 34 rue des Sapins Mercier, Québec J6R 1X9 / CA | 02 /
PAOLELLA, Andrea 4105 avenue Laval Montréal, Québec H2W 2J4 / CA | 03 /
DAIGLE, Jean-Christophe 270 rue Cicot St-Bruno-De-Montarville, Québec J3V 1V7 / CA | 04 /
COMMARIEU, Basile 3815 rue St-Denis Montréal, Québec H2W 2M4 / CA | 05 /
ARMAND, Michel 8 rue Daguerre 75014 Paris / FR | 06 /
ZAGHIB, Karim 2006 rue Marcelle Ferron Longueuil, Québec J4N 1T8 / CA | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2023/48] |
Former [2020/33] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18864901.6 | 02.10.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018CA51239 | Priority number, date | CA20172981012 | 02.10.2017 Original published format: CA 2981012 | [2020/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019068182 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3692017 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3692017 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/48, C08G75/14, H01M10/056, H01M4/137, C08G73/00 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
C08G75/14 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/602 (EP,KR,US);
C07D209/48 (EP,KR,US);
C08G73/1064 (EP,KR);
H01M10/05 (EP);
H01M10/052 (KR,US);
H01M10/0565 (KR,US);
H01M10/0567 (KR,US);
H01M10/0568 (US);
H01M10/0569 (US);
H01M4/137 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/38 (KR,US);
H01M4/623 (KR,US);
H01M4/625 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2004/028 (KR);
H01M2300/0025 (US);
H01M2300/0082 (KR,US);
H01M2300/0085 (KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/33] | C07D209/48, C08G75/14, H01M10/056, H01M4/137 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWEFELHALTIGE VERBINDUNGEN UND POLYMERE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IN ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN ZELLEN | [2020/33] | English: | SULFUR-CONTAINING COMPOUNDS AND POLYMERS AND THE USE THEREOF IN ELECTROCHEMICAL CELLS | [2020/33] | French: | POLYMÈRES ET COMPOSÉS SOUFRÉS ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LES CELLULES ÉLECTROCHIMIQUES | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 15.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 29.11.2023 | |
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 29.11.2023 | |
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 29.11.2023 | |
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0213573 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]US4716216 (TAKEKOSHI TOHRU [US], et al); | [A]EP0387106 (TOMOEGAWA PAPER CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0449117 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE4243463 (BASF AG [DE]) | International search | [A]CA1123543 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [A]DE4243463 (BASF AG [DE]); | [X]WO9954363 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]); | by applicant | US2981012 |