15.08.2024 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] |
25.05.2024 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.12.2023 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.03.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.12.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.12.2022 |
First examination report |
|
16.09.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.05.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.12.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] |
11.12.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] |
21.10.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
16.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
16.10.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
17.07.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
17.07.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
14.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.05.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
04.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|