EP3694696 - ACTIVE AERO SYSTEM IN-MOLD ASSEMBLY HINGE MODULAR FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna Exteriors Inc. 50 Casmir Court Concord, Ontario L4K 4J5 / CA | [2020/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDBERG, Braendon 1256 Queens Dr. Oxford Michigan 48371 / US | 02 /
PARPART, Ross J. 358 Ivy Lane Troy Michigan 48098 / US | 03 /
POVINELLI, Anthony J. 179 Tillson Street Romeo Michigan 48065 / US | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [2020/34] | Application number, filing date | 18865504.7 | 10.10.2018 | [2020/34] | WO2018IB57868 | Priority number, date | US201762570391P | 10.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762570391 P | [2020/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019073422 | Date: | 18.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3694696 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 18.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/08, B29C45/00, B29C45/16, // B29C45/06, B29L31/22, B29L31/30, B29L31/00 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
B29C45/0017 (EP,US);
B29C45/006 (EP);
B29C45/0081 (EP);
B29C45/14336 (US);
B29C2045/0065 (EP,US);
B29C2045/0068 (EP);
B29C2045/1601 (EP,US);
B29C2045/1659 (EP);
B29C45/06 (EP);
B29L2031/22 (EP);
B29L2031/3055 (EP);
B29L2031/779 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/34] | B29C45/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] | Title | German: | MODULARER RAHMEN FÜR EIN AKTIVES AERO-SYSTEM MIT IN EINER FORM MONTIERTEM SCHARNIER | [2020/34] | English: | ACTIVE AERO SYSTEM IN-MOLD ASSEMBLY HINGE MODULAR FRAME | [2020/34] | French: | CADRE MODULAIRE DE CHARNIÈRE D'ASSEMBLAGE DANS LE MOULE D'UN SYSTÈME AÉRONAUTIQUE ACTIF | [2020/34] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 05.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/38] | 24.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1554635 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]DE3340122 (FICKENSCHER & CO GMBH WERKZEUG [DE]); | [XYI]DE29610691U (JOKEY PLASTIK WIPPERFUERTH [DE]); | [Y]WO2007054235 (ABATE BASILIO & C S N C [IT], et al); | [XI]DE102012221698 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [Y]CN105538600 (ACOT TOOLING (XIAMEN) CO LTD); | [Y]CN106240345 (TIANJIN AOLIDASEN MOULD CO LTD) | International search | [A]US6854768 (ELDER JACK E [US]); | [X]US2005150087 (LYDAN ROBERT [CA]); | [A]CN105538600 (ACOT TOOLING (XIAMEN) CO LTD) |