EP3695590 - TRANSPARENT FAX CALL PROCESSING IN A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consensus Cloud Solutions International Ltd Unit 31, Woodford Park Santry Dublin 662812 / IE | [2023/02] |
Former [2020/34] | For all designated states Advanced Messaging Technologies, Inc. 700 South Flower Street, Suite 1500 Los Angeles, California 90017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREEMAN, Kirk Allen 700 South Flower St., Suite 1500 Los Angeles California 90017 / US | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | KIPA AB Drottninggatan 11 252 21 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/34] | KIPA AB P O Box 1065 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 18865598.9 | 02.10.2018 | [2020/34] | WO2018US54032 | Priority number, date | US201715784030 | 13.10.2017 Original published format: US201715784030 | [2020/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019074726 | Date: | 18.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3695590 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04N1/00, H04N1/327, H04N1/32, H04M19/04, H04M1/724, H04W4/16 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
H04M19/04 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US);
H04M1/72403 (US);
H04N1/00209 (EP,US);
H04N1/3201 (EP,US);
H04N1/32048 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/34] | H04M1/725, H04N1/00, H04N1/327 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] | Title | German: | TRANSPARENTE FAXVERBINDUNGSVERARBEITUNG BEI EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG | [2020/34] | English: | TRANSPARENT FAX CALL PROCESSING IN A MOBILE DEVICE | [2020/34] | French: | TRAITEMENT TRANSPARENT D'APPEL DE TÉLÉCOPIE DANS UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2020/34] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 29.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.12.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8041014 (DAILY DANIEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 7, line 22 - column 8, line 63; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2013242353 (BARD THOMAS AUSTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0039] , [0040]; figure 5 * | International search | [A]JP2010087877 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0026]-[0055], claim 1 and figures 1-5. *; | [Y]US8428228 (BAXTER JR JOHN FRANCIS [TH]) [Y] 1-7, 9-10, 12, 18 * See column 4, line 46 - colunm 9, line 16 and figures 1-6. *; | [A]US2013188228 (POON TAI CHEUNG [HK]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0011]-[0024], claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [A]US2013242353 (BARD THOMAS AUSTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0035]-[0040], claim 1 and figures 2-5. *; | [XY]JP2017034647 (ADVANCED MESSAGING TECH INC) [X] 8, 11, 13-17, 19-20 * See paragraphs [0014]-[0026], claims 1-5 and figures 1-7C. * [Y] 1-7, 9-10, 12, 18 | by applicant | US4571240 | US6402771 | US2009312745 | US8357179 | US8679142 | US9211132 | US2016022964 |