EP3694803 - CLAMPING DEVICE WITH SINGLE MOVABLE JAW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nguyen, Nhon Hoa 174 South Terrace Bankstown, New South Wales 2200 / AU | [2020/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | Süle, Ákos, et al Rungestraße 25 10179 Berlin / DE | [2020/34] | Application number, filing date | 18866409.8 | 10.10.2018 | [2020/34] | WO2018IB57829 | Priority number, date | US201762570108P | 10.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762570108 P | US201762584923P | 13.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762584923 P | US201862741555P | 05.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862741555 P | US201862741557P | 05.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862741557 P | US201816154734 | 09.10.2018 Original published format: US201816154734 | [2020/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019073392 | Date: | 18.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3694803 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/44, B66C1/48, F16B2/10 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
B66C1/442 (EP,AU);
B66C1/48 (AU,US);
F16B2/10 (AU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] | Title | German: | SPANNVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER BEWEGLICHEN EINZELBACKE | [2020/34] | English: | CLAMPING DEVICE WITH SINGLE MOVABLE JAW | [2020/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE À MÂCHOIRE MOBILE UNIQUE | [2020/34] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 08.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 08.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.06.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2021 | 31.10.2022 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.05.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US1192504 (CRUM HOLLIS B [US]); | [X]GB739720 (PRIESTMAN BROTHERS); | [X]US2924484 (TOLSMA WILLIAM A); | [A]GB1224694 (HERBERT MORRIS BROWN LENOX LTD [GB]); | [A]DE2818443 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE); | [A]DE3713333 (BOECKER ALBERT GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [X]CN106429821 (CHIFENG XINHAI ENERGY SAVING BUILDING MAT CO LTD) |