EP3695367 - INFORMATION ENRICHMENT USING GLOBAL STRUCTURE LEARNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yodlee, Inc. 3600 Bridge Parkway, Suite 200 Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2020/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADIB, Atif 406 Shri Manjunatha 4th Main 4th Block, 1st Stage, HBR Layout Bangalore 5600643 / IN | 02 /
PATIL, Deepak Chandrakant 2 Jai-Shreekrupa CHS. Lane no. 6 Pendsenagar, V.P. Cross road Dombivli (East) Dist. Thane Maharashtra 421201 / IN | 03 /
VARMA, Preethy A003 Sankalp Cherry Blossom Edga Road Varthur Bangalore Karnataka 560087 / IN | 04 /
SAWANT, Priyanka 303 Pavani Prime Sai baba Temple Road Near Kundanhalli Gate, Munnekolala Bangalore Karnataka 560037 / IN | 05 /
MANJUNATH, VInay 548/1c 2nd floor 10th A Cross Kodihalli Bangalore Karnataka 560008 / IN | 06 /
DESHMUKH, Om Dadaji 552 8A Main Road Sector A Yelahanka New Town Bangalore Karnataka 560064 / IN | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/34] | Conroy, John Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18866522.8 | 08.10.2018 | [2020/34] | WO2018US54863 | Priority number, date | US201715728457 | 09.10.2017 Original published format: US201715728457 | [2020/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019074844 | Date: | 18.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3695367 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06N3/02, G06K9/62, G06K9/46 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
G06N3/08 (EP,US);
G06N3/044 (EP);
G06N7/01 (EP);
G06Q30/01 (EP);
G06Q30/0201 (EP);
G06Q30/04 (EP);
G06Q40/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSANREICHERUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON GLOBALEM STRUKTURLERNEN | [2020/34] | English: | INFORMATION ENRICHMENT USING GLOBAL STRUCTURE LEARNING | [2020/34] | French: | ENRICHISSEMENT D'INFORMATIONS À L'AIDE D'UN APPRENTISSAGE DE STRUCTURE GLOBALE | [2020/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 20.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US6523019 (BORTHWICK ANDREW E [US]) [A] 1-20* See claim 1 and figures 1-21. *; | [Y]US2014040272 (HOUGHTON DAVID F [US]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0031]-[0037], claims 1,8 and figures 3-5. *; | [Y]US2016306876 (NICHOLS GABRIEL [US], et al) [Y] 3-7, 10-14, 17-20 * See paragraphs [0028],[0059],[0079] and figures 2-8. *; | [A]US2017052958 (MANNING LAWRENCE [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0154],[0161] and figures 1,6-7. *; | [Y]US2017060835 (RADFORD WILLIAM [FR], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0014],[0062]-[0069],[0086], claims 1-3,20 and figures 1-2. * | by applicant | US2014040272 | US2017060835 |