EP3695242 - ENHANCED ALERT/NOTIFICATION SYSTEM FOR LAW ENFORCEMENT IDENTIFYING AND TRACKING OF STOLEN VEHICLES AND CARGO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Overhaul Group, Inc. 900 S. Capital of Texas Highway Suite 151 Austin, TX 78746 / US | For all designated states Conlon, Barry 3504 Juniper Rim Road Leander, Texas 78641 / US | [2020/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONLON, Barry 3504 Juniper Rim Road Leander Texas 78641 / US | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | Pure Ideas Limited 25 Meer Street Stratford-Upon-Avon Warwickshire CV37 6QB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/34] | Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18866753.9 | 10.10.2018 | [2020/34] | WO2018US55312 | Priority number, date | US201762570185P | 10.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762570185 P | [2020/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019075138 | Date: | 18.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3695242 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, G01S13/00, G01S13/74, G06F15/16, G01S19/16, G01S19/21 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
G01S19/16 (EP);
G01S19/21 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/34] | G01S5/02, G01S13/00, G01S13/74, G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES WARN-/BENACHRICHTIGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR DIE STRAFVERFOLGUNG ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND VERFOLGUNG GESTOHLENER FAHRZEUGE UND FRACHT | [2020/34] | English: | ENHANCED ALERT/NOTIFICATION SYSTEM FOR LAW ENFORCEMENT IDENTIFYING AND TRACKING OF STOLEN VEHICLES AND CARGO | [2020/34] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ALERTE/DE NOTIFICATION AMÉLIORÉ POUR L'IDENTIFICATION ET LE SUIVI DE VÉHICULES VOLÉS ET DE MARCHANDISES VOLÉES PAR LES FORCES DE L'ORDRE | [2020/34] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 24.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 08.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 11.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016187169 (OVERHAUL GROUP INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 39, paragraph 114 - page 43, paragraph 124 * * figures 16,17 ** abstract *; | [E]WO2019028443 (OVERHAUL GROUP INC [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * page 8, paragraph 34 - page 39, paragraph 119 * * figures 1A-10 * * abstract * | International search | [A]US4818998 (APSELL SHELDON P [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]US6842774 (PICCIONI ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [Y]US2005136912 (CURATOLO BENEDICT S [US], et al) [Y] 1-4, 6-10 * entire document *; | [Y]US2013033381 (BREED DAVID S [US]) [Y] 2-4, 6, 7, 9, 10 * entire document *; | [Y]US2015111524 (SOUTH JOHN A [US]) [Y] 1-4, 6-10 * entire document *; | [A]US2016050356 (NALEPKA MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [A]US2017164176 (LIEU TIM [US]) [A] 1-10 * entire document * | by applicant | US2005136912 | US2013033381 | US2015111524 | WO2019028443 |