EP3665343 - CONSTRUCTION COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Charitou, George 32 William Street King City, Ontario L7B 1L1 / CA | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Sach, Greg Robert Valet Patent Services Limited c/o Caya 83713X Am Börstig 5 96052 Bamberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/25] | Sach, Greg Robert Sach & Associates Siedlungsstrasse 4a 85253 Erdweg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18866931.1 | 16.08.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018CA50994 | Priority number, date | US201715730820 | 12.10.2017 Original published format: US201715730820 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019071338 | Date: | 18.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3665343 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 18.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E04G11/48, E04G11/50, E04G25/00 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
E04G11/50 (EP,KR,US);
E04G11/38 (EP,KR,US);
E04G11/48 (EP,US);
E04G11/483 (EP,KR,US);
E04G11/52 (EP);
E04G9/02 (US);
E04G2011/505 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | E04G23/04, E04G25/00, E04G25/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Title | German: | BAUELEMENT | [2020/25] | English: | CONSTRUCTION COMPONENT | [2020/25] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CONSTRUCTION | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 07.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0054802 (STREIF AG [DE]); | [X]EP3112556 (FARESIN BUILDING DIV S P A [IT]); | [X]EP3176349 (FARESIN BUILDING DIV S P A [IT]); | [X]EP3202998 (ULMA C Y E S COOP [ES]) | International search | [X]US5062733 (CHOLID YANBO [DE], et al) |