EP3571808 - IMPROVING BLOCKCHAIN TRANSACTION SPEEDS USING GLOBAL ACCELERATION NODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced New Technologies Co., Ltd. Cayman Corporate Centre 27 Hospital Road George Town, Grand Cayman KY1-9008 / KY | [2021/03] |
Former [2020/50] | For all designated states Alibaba Group Holding Limited Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town Grand Cayman / KY | ||
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states ADVANCED NEW TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Cayman Corporate Centre 27 Hospital Road George Town, Grand Cayman KY1-9008 / KY | ||
Former [2019/48] | For all designated states Alibaba Group Holding Limited Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town Grand Cayman / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIA, Ning Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F, Building 3 No.969 West Wen Yi Road, Yu Hang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | Conroy, John Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18866984.0 | 28.12.2018 | [2019/48] | WO2018CN124975 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019072308 | Date: | 18.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3571808 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, G06Q20/40, H04L9/32 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
H04L9/3239 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/00 (US);
H04L9/50 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/0643 (US);
H04L9/3247 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/48] | H04L9/08, G06Q20/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG DER GESCHWINDIGKEIT VON BLOCKCHAIN-TRANSAKTIONEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON GLOBALEN BESCHLEUNIGUNGSKNOTEN | [2019/48] | English: | IMPROVING BLOCKCHAIN TRANSACTION SPEEDS USING GLOBAL ACCELERATION NODES | [2019/48] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DE VITESSES DE TRANSACTIONS DE CHAÎNES DE BLOCS À L'AIDE DE N UDS D'ACCÉLÉRATION GLOBALE | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 31.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/01] | 29.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.12.2021 | 02.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017132625 (KENNEDY DENNIS M [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0046] *; | [A]US2018294967 (ROBERTS BENJAMIN MARK [CA], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] ** paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0048]; figure 3 *; | [I]WO2018234987 (NCHAIN HOLDINGS LTD [AG]) [I] 1-9 * page 3, line 7 - page 5, line 31 * * page 7, line 1 - page 17, line 27; figures 1,4 * |