EP3695635 - MITIGATING RISK FOR HANDS-FREE INTERACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visa International Service Association 900 Metro Center Boulevard Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2020/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGNER, Kim R. 606 Alberta Avenue Sunnyvale California 94087 / US | 02 /
SHEETS, John F. 915 Elizabeth Street San Francisco California 94114 / US | 03 /
NELSON, Mark P.O.Box 8999 San Francisco, California 94128 / US | [2023/27] |
Former [2020/34] | 01 /
WAGNER, Kim R. 606 Alberta Avenue Sunnyvale California 94087 / US | ||
02 /
SHEETS, John F. 915 Elizabeth Street San Francisco California 94114 / US | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2023/41] |
Former [2020/34] | EIP EIP Europe LLP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18867076.4 | 25.07.2018 | [2020/34] | WO2018US43670 | Priority number, date | US201762572019P | 13.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762572019 P | [2020/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019074568 | Date: | 18.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3695635 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3695635 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/06, H04W12/08, G06F21/32, G06F21/44, G06Q20/40, G06Q20/32, G06Q20/20, H04L9/40, H04W12/30 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
H04W12/06 (EP);
H04W12/069 (EP,US);
G06F21/32 (EP);
G06F21/44 (EP);
G06Q20/20 (EP);
G06Q20/32 (EP);
G06Q20/40145 (EP);
H04L63/0861 (EP,US);
H04W12/122 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/42] | H04W12/06, H04W12/08, H04L29/06, G06F21/32, G06F21/44, G06Q20/40, G06Q20/32, G06Q20/20 | ||
Former IPC [2020/34] | H04W12/06, H04W12/08, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MINDERUNG DES RISIKOS FÜR FREISPRECHINTERAKTIONEN | [2020/34] | English: | MITIGATING RISK FOR HANDS-FREE INTERACTIONS | [2020/34] | French: | ATTÉNUATION DES RISQUES LORS D'INTERACTIONS MAINS LIBRES | [2020/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 09.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008209515 (IBRAHIM WAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0030] *; | [Y]GB2492614 (BARCLAYS BANK PLC [GB]) [Y] 4,13 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US2014129231 (HERRING DEAN F [US], et al) [Y] 2,11* paragraph [0005] *; | [A]US2014337635 (KONVALINKA IRA [CA]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] *; | [IY]WO2017075063 (VISA INT SERVICE ASS [US]) [I] 1,3,5-10,12,14,15 * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0096] * [Y] 2,4,11,13 | International search | [Y]US2014337232 (GLASGO MICHAEL LAINE [US]) [Y] 1-23 * See paragraphs [0104]-[0126]; claim 1; and figure 7. *; | [A]EP2813961 (KONVALINKA IRA [CA]) [A] 1-23* See paragraphs [0031]-[0033]; and claim 1. *; | [A]US2016321671 (CHANDRASEKARAN SASHIKANTH [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0098]; and figure 3. *; | [Y]WO2017019972 (VISA INT SERVICE ASS [US]) [Y] 1-23 * See paragraphs [0025], [0057]-[0085]; and figure 5. *; | [Y]US2017180128 (LU HONGQIAN KAREN [US]) [Y] 5, 13, 22 * See paragraphs [0075]-[0083]; and claim 7. * | by applicant | US2008209515 | GB2492614 | US2014129231 | US2014337635 | WO2017075063 |