EP3697410 - BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.02.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Pharma Limited 2-1, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | [2022/09] |
Former [2020/35] | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Thousand Oaks, CA 91320 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTBERGER, Michael D. c/o Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks California 91320-1799 / US | 02 /
CHAKKA, Nagasree c/o Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks California 91320-1799 / US | 03 /
GAO, Hua c/o Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks California 91320-1799 / US | 04 /
GUZMAN-PEREZ, Angel c/o Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks California 91320-1799 / US | 05 /
HORNE, Daniel B. c/o Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks California 91320-1799 / US | 06 /
HUA, Zihao c/o Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks California 91320-1799 / US | 07 /
KIEFFER, Madeleine c/o Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks California 91320-1799 / US | 08 /
LIN, Daniel C. H. c/o Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks California 91320-1799 / US | 09 /
MILGRAM, Benjamin Charles c/o Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks California 91320-1799 / US | 10 /
PANTELEEV, Jane c/o Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks California 91320-1799 / US | 11 /
SCHENKEL, Laurie c/o Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks California 91320-1799 / US | 12 /
STELLWAGEN, John c/o Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks California 91320-1799 / US | 13 /
WEISS, Matthew c/o Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks California 91320-1799 / US | 14 /
WHITE, Ryan D. c/o Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks California 91320-1799 / US | 15 /
ZHAO, Wei c/o Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks California 91320-1799 / US | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18867844.5 | 18.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018US56484 | Priority number, date | US201762574465P | 19.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762574465 P | US201862671090P | 14.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862671090 P | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019079578 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3697410 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/40, A61K31/50, A61K31/5025, C07D487/00, C07D487/02, C07D487/04, A61P9/00, A61P11/00, A61P5/00, A61P35/00 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
A61P13/12 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D401/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/437 (IL,KR);
A61K31/4545 (IL,KR);
A61K31/506 (IL,KR);
C07D401/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D409/14 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D413/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D471/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D471/10 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D487/02 (IL,KR);
C07D487/04 (EP,IL);
C07D491/052 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D491/08 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D491/107 (EP,IL,KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/35] | A61K31/40, A61K31/50, A61K31/5025, C07D487/00, C07D487/02, C07D487/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | 05.05.2020 | ME | 05.05.2020 | Validation states | KH | 05.05.2020 | MA | 05.05.2020 | MD | 05.05.2020 | TN | 05.05.2020 | Title | German: | BENZIMIDAZOLDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | [2020/35] | English: | BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USES | [2020/35] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE BENZIMIDAZOLE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 09.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2368876 (SANOFI SA [FR]) | International search | [A]US2004106655 (KITAJIMA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2004152690 (BALAN CHENERA [US], et al); |