EP3669289 - METHOD AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR TRANSLATING SPEECH SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Ji-sang 1215-504 50 Mokdongdong-ro Yangcheon-Gu Seoul 07937 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Sang-ha 309 11 Olympic-ro 35ga-gil Songpa-Gu Seoul 05510 / KR | 03 /
RYU, Jong-youb 636-1902 16 Dongtanbanseok-ro Hwaseong-Si Gyeonggi-do 18457 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Yoon-jung 1F 24 Hancheon-ro 38ga-gil Dongdaemun-Gu Seoul 02525 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Eun-kyoung 644-1701 21 Maeyeong-ro 39beon-gil Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-do 16524 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Jae-won 105-701 37 Samseong-ro 51-gil Gangnam-Gu Seoul 06280 / KR | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/26] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18867918.7 | 17.10.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018KR12261 | Priority number, date | KR20170135244 | 18.10.2017 Original published format: KR 20170135244 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019078615 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3669289 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F40/58, G10L15/00, G10L15/26, G10L13/00 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
G06F40/58 (EP,US);
G10L15/005 (KR,US);
G10L13/04 (US);
G10L15/26 (EP,KR,US);
G10L13/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/26] | G06F17/28, G10L15/00, G10L15/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERSETZUNG VON SPRACHSIGNALEN | [2020/26] | English: | METHOD AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR TRANSLATING SPEECH SIGNAL | [2020/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR TRADUIRE UN SIGNAL VOCAL | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 18.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/29] | 29.02.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.03.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009144048 (DVORIN YUVAL [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9-11,13,15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0 22] , [0 23] * [I] 1-15; | [XI]US2016078020 (SUMITA KAZUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9-11,13,15 * abstract * * claim 2 * * paragraph [0119]; figure 14 *[I] 1-15 | International search | [Y]US5873055 (OKUNISHI TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * See column 9, lines 7-51; and column 15, line 1 - column 17, line 20. *; | [Y]US6952665 (SHIMOMURA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [Y] 8 * See column 1, lines 56-62. *; | [A]KR20110032394 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0031]-[0036]; and claims 1-2. *; | [Y]US2013297284 (CHOI SUNG-KWON [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0046], [0071]-[0072]: and claims 1-2, 8. *; | [A]JP2017146587 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0051]-[0057]; and claim 1. * |