EP3701299 - RETROREFLECTIVE ARTICLE COMPRISING LOCALLY-LAMINATED REFLECTIVE LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTRIK, Kevin W. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
CHEN-HO, Kui 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
JONES, Scott J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
MCCOY, Michael A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
MERTON, Christopher A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
NIWAS, Shri 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
KUDUVA RAMAN THANUMOORTHY, Ramasubramani 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 08 /
XIA, Ying 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/36] | Mathys & Squire Mathys & Squire Europe LLP Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18870702.0 | 25.10.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018US57553 | Priority number, date | US201762578343P | 27.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762578343 P | US201862739506P | 01.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862739506 P | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019084295 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3701299 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 02.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/128, B32B5/00 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
G02B5/128 (EP,US);
A41D31/325 (US);
B32B37/0076 (US);
B32B37/025 (US);
B32B38/10 (US);
C03C12/02 (US);
B32B2037/268 (US);
B32B2305/073 (US);
B32B2305/30 (US);
B32B2307/416 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/36] | G02B5/128 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Title | German: | RÜCKSTRAHLENDER ARTIKEL MIT LOKAL LAMINIERTEN REFLEKTIERENDEN SCHICHTEN | [2020/36] | English: | RETROREFLECTIVE ARTICLE COMPRISING LOCALLY-LAMINATED REFLECTIVE LAYERS | [2020/36] | French: | ARTICLE RÉTRORÉFLÉCHISSANT COMPRENANT DES COUCHES RÉFLÉCHISSANTES STRATIFIÉES LOCALEMENT | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 12.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0404539 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 2, 3 *; | [XAI]US5866236 (FAYKISH LYNN E [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * col. 4, lin 1-12;; figure 3 * [A] 9-15 [I] 4-8; | [XA]US6153128 (LIGHTLE VERA L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9,10 * col. 6, lin. 50 to col. 7, lin 6; col. 11, lin 64 to col 12, lin. 3;; figures 2-6 * [A] 14,15; | [XAI]WO0129587 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1 * p. 6, lin. 11-15;; figures 1, 4b * [A] 14,15 [I] 2-8; | [A]US2001026860 (BENSON GERALD M [US], et al) [A] 14,15* paragraph [0034]; figures 3E-3G *; | [XI]WO2010006102 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-13 * p. 39, lin. 6-31;; figures 1, 7, 16, 20 * [I] 2-8; | [XAI]US2011292508 (HUANG NINGYONG [CN], et al) [X] 1,9-12 * paragraphs [0028] - [0032] - [ 0038] , [ 0048] , [ 0061]; figure 1c * [A] 14,15 [I] 2-8; | [A]US2017276844 (MCCOY MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0007]; figures 3, 4 * | International search | [X]US3700305 (BINGHAM WALLACE KARL) [X] 1-21* col. 2, lines 53-66; Figure 2; Example 1 *; | [X]US5064272 (BAILEY TERRY R [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * col. 5, line 61 - col. 6, line 7; col. 10, lines 40-55; Figures *; | [X]EP0512668 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-21 * page 3, lines 13-35; Examples; Figures 1-2. *; | [XA]WO2010006102 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * page 22, lines 4-17; page 39, lines 6-31; Figures 7 & 20 * [A] 24-28; | [X]US2016245966 (EDWARDS BRUCE H [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * para. [0019], [0039], [0074]-[0079], [0091]; Examples; Figures 1-2 * | by applicant | US3700305 | US4763985 | US5223276 | US5344705 | WO9936248 | WO0129587 | US7018713 | US2010316852 | US2011292508 | US8658248 | US9327441 | US2017131444 | US2017192142 | US2017276844 | US2017293056 | US19920624789 | US19430625783 | US20200626750 | US19540625366 |