EP3701250 - FLUORESCENT DYE ACCUMULATION ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellpharma Kft. Karolina út 29-31. 1113 Budapest / HU | For all designated states Természettudományi Kutatóközpont Magyar tudósok körútja 2 1117 Budapest / HU | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SZABÓ, Edit Ady Endre út 67. 2. ajtó 1221 Budapest / HU | 02 /
KOVÁCS-TÜRK, Dóra Meredek u. 28. 1. emelet 5. ajtó 1112 Budapest / HU | 03 /
TELBISZ, Ágnes Bíró László u. 22. 1089 Budapest / HU | 04 /
KUCSMA, Nóra Báthori u. 7. 1191 Budapest / HU | 05 /
HORVÁTH, Tamás Köves út 82. 1237 Budapest / HU | 06 /
SZAKÁCS, Gergely 1026 Budapest Nyúl u. 4. Budapest / HU | 07 /
HOMOLYA, László Áfonya köz 13. 2089 Telki / HU | 08 /
SARKADI, Balázs Ágnes út 23/B. 1121 Budapest / HU | 09 /
VÁRADY, György Báthori u. 7. 1191 Budapest / HU | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Danubia Patent & Law Office LLC Bajcsy-Zsilinszky út 16 1051 Budapest / HU | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 18870920.8 | 25.10.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018HU50046 | Priority number, date | HU20170000432 | 25.10.2017 Original published format: HU 1700432 | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019081957 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3701250 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XV | 02.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N33/60, G01N33/58, G01N33/50, C07K14/00 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
C07K14/00 (HU);
G01N33/582 (EP,US);
C12P17/06 (US);
G01N21/64 (HU,US);
G01N33/5035 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Title | German: | FLUORESZENZFARBSTOFF-AKKUMULATIONSTEST | [2020/36] | English: | FLUORESCENT DYE ACCUMULATION ASSAY | [2020/36] | French: | DOSAGE D'ACCUMULATION DE COLORANT FLUORESCENT | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: XV | 25.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 10.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2011139634 (ENZO LIFE SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * table 1; claim 4 *; | [Y] - STROUSE J JACOB ET AL, "Fluorescent substrates for flow cytometric evaluation of efflux inhibition in ABCB1, ABCC1, and ABCG2 transporters", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20130305), vol. 437, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.AB.2013.02.018, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 77 - 87, XP028545924 [Y] 1-15 * abstract; tables 1,2; fig. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2013.02.018 | [XP] - SZABÓ EDIT ET AL, "A new fluorescent dye accumulation assay for parallel measurements of the ABCG2, ABCB1 and ABCC1 multidrug transporter functions", PLOS ONE, (20180117), vol. 13, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0190629, page e0190629, XP055824472 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0190629 | International search | [A]HUP0002557 (SOLVO BIOTECHNOLOGIAI KFT [HU]) [A] 1-29* Abstract and pages 4-10 *; | [XA]WO2009052183 (INVITROGEN CORP [US], et al) [X] 26-27a and 28-29 * Paragraphs [0011-0013], [0049] and claims 72 and 73 * [A] 1-25 and 27b; | [A] - Iain Johnson (ed.), "Chapter 19: Indicators for Ca2+, Mg2+, Zn2+ and Other Metal Ions", The Molecular Probes® Handbook, A GUIDE TO FLUORESCENT PROBES AND LABELING TECHNOLOGIES, (20100000), pages 829 - 882, ISBN 978-0-9829279-1-5, XP009520829 [A] 1-29 | [A] - HORNOLYA L. et al., "Fluorescent Cellular Indicators Ate Extruded by the Multidrug Resistance Protein", J Biol Chem., (19931015), vol. 268, no. 29, pages 21493 - 6, XP055073841 [A] 1-29 * Abstract and page 21496 cited by the application * |