EP3701279 - SPATIAL AND TEMPORAL ENCODING OF ACOUSTIC WAVEFORMS FOR FULL SYNTHETIC TRANSMIT APERTURE IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Decision Sciences Medical Company, LLC 12345 First American Way Suite 100 Poway, CA 92064 / US | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUSE, Dustin E. 12345 First American Way Suite 100 Poway CA 92064 / US | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 18871063.6 | 27.10.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018US57891 | Priority number, date | US201762578351P | 27.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762578351 P | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019084526 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3701279 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S15/89, G10K11/34 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
G01S15/8959 (EP,KR,US);
A61B8/4488 (US);
A61B8/5207 (US);
A61B8/5269 (US);
A61B8/587 (US);
G01S15/8927 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/36] | G01S1/26, G01S7/28, G01S7/493, G01S7/523, G01S7/527, G10K15/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Title | German: | RÄUMLICHE UND ZEITLICHE CODIERUNG VON AKUSTISCHEN WELLENFORMEN ZUR KOMPLETTEN SYNTHETIC-TRANSMIT-APERTURE-BILDGEBUNG | [2020/36] | English: | SPATIAL AND TEMPORAL ENCODING OF ACOUSTIC WAVEFORMS FOR FULL SYNTHETIC TRANSMIT APERTURE IMAGING | [2020/36] | French: | CODAGE SPATIAL ET TEMPOREL DE FORMES D'ONDE ACOUSTIQUES POUR IMAGERIE D'OUVERTURE DE TRANSMISSION SYNTHÉTIQUE COMPLÈTE | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 31.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016065323 (ZEMP ROGER [CA]) | International search | [Y]US2002138002 (TARAKCI UMIT [US], et al) [Y] 15, 24 * , para [0005], [0043]; Fig 2 *; | [A]US2014364737 (HUANG LIANJIE [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * see entire document *; | [Y]US2015080725 (WEGNER ALLAN [US]) [Y] 9 * , para [0004], [0089]; Fig 6 *; | [A]US2015265250 (MADORE BRUNO [US]) [A] 1-27* , entire document *; | [A]US2016061950 (XU YUAN [CA], et al) [A] 1-27 * , entire document *; | [Y]US2016249882 (DEGERTEKIN FAHRETTIN LEVENT [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * , para [0003], [0038], [0042] *; | [XY]US2016270763 (HAYES JAMES J [US], et al) [X] 19-23, 25-27 * , para [0007]-[0005], [0028], [0033], [0038]-[0040], [0042], [0055]-[0056], [0060]-[0061], [0063]-[0065], [0069], [0083]; Fig 1, 2D, 7A, 11 * [Y] 1-18, 24; | [A]US2017276775 (TANTER MICKAËL [FR], et al) [A] 1-27 * , entire document * | by applicant | US2016065323 |