Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3700871 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201880083167 CN202110539754 CN202410885318 CN202410885321 EP18871435 JP2020522710 JP2023181649 KR20207014446 US201715840040 US2018057009W

More

US201816157663 US201816171939 US201916404783 US201916531769 US202017011377 US202117333758 US202217699294 US202318130967



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2023312405Global Dossier 05.10.2023A1
Priority number Date
US201816171939 26.10.2018
US201762575763 23.10.2017
US201816157663 11.10.2018
US201715840040 13.12.2017
WO2018US57009 23.10.2018
US201916531769 05.08.2019
US202117333758 28.05.2021
US202318130967 05.04.2023
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11912609Global Dossier 27.02.2024B2
US2022204390 30.06.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201715840040 13.12.2017
US201816157663 11.10.2018
US202017011377 03.09.2020
US202217699294 21.03.2022
US201916404783 07.05.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11643359Global Dossier 09.05.2023B2
US2021284570 16.09.2021A1
Priority number Date
US201816171939 26.10.2018
US201762575763 23.10.2017
US201816157663 11.10.2018
US201715840040 13.12.2017
WO2018US57009 23.10.2018
US201916531769 05.08.2019
US202117333758 28.05.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11312653Global Dossier 26.04.2022B2
US2020399168 24.12.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201715840040 13.12.2017
US201816157663 11.10.2018
US202017011377 03.09.2020
US201916404783 07.05.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11046609Global Dossier 29.06.2021B2
US2019352221 21.11.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201816171939 26.10.2018
US201762575763 23.10.2017
US201715840040 13.12.2017
US201816157663 11.10.2018
WO2018US57009 23.10.2018
US201916531769 05.08.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10807906Global Dossier 20.10.2020B2
US2019256408 22.08.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201715840040 13.12.2017
US201816157663 11.10.2018
US201916404783 07.05.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10450220Global Dossier 22.10.2019B2
US2019177212 13.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201816171939 26.10.2018
US201715840040 13.12.2017
US201816157663 11.10.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10370291Global Dossier 06.08.2019B2
US2019177211 13.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201715840040 13.12.2017
US201816157663 11.10.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10246371Global Dossier 02.04.2019B1
Priority number Date
US201715840040 13.12.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20200062349Global Dossier 03.06.2020A
Priority number Date
US201762575763 23.10.2017
US201715840040 13.12.2017
WO2018US57009 23.10.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2024010059Global Dossier 23.01.2024A
Priority number Date
JP2020522710 23.10.2018
US201762575763 23.10.2017
US201715840040 13.12.2017
WO2018US57009 23.10.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP7429189BGlobal Dossier 07.02.2024B2
JP2021500299 07.01.2021A
Priority number Date
US201762575763 23.10.2017
US201715840040 13.12.2017
WO2018US57009 23.10.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN118702410Global Dossier 27.09.2024A
Priority number Date
US201762575763 23.10.2017
CN201880083167 23.10.2018
US201715840040 13.12.2017
WO2018US57009 23.10.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN118666493Global Dossier 20.09.2024A
Priority number Date
US201762575763 23.10.2017
CN201880083167 23.10.2018
US201715840040 13.12.2017
WO2018US57009 23.10.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN113185129BGlobal Dossier 27.05.2022B
CN113185129 30.07.2021A
Priority number Date
US201762575763 23.10.2017
CN201880083167 23.10.2018
US201715840040 13.12.2017
WO2018US57009 23.10.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN111511696Global Dossier 07.08.2020A
Priority number Date
US201762575763 23.10.2017
US201715840040 13.12.2017
WO2018US57009 23.10.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3700871Global Dossier 04.08.2021A4
EP3700871 02.09.2020A2
Priority number Date
US201762575763 23.10.2017
US201715840040 13.12.2017
WO2018US57009 23.10.2018
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2019083937Global Dossier 20.06.2019A3
WO2019083937 02.05.2019A2
Priority number Date
US201762575763 23.10.2017
US201715840040 13.12.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NL2021858B 24.10.2019B1
NL2021858 25.04.2019A
Priority number Date
US201762575763 23.10.2017
US201715840040 13.12.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI811252B 11.08.2023B
TW201922660 16.06.2019A
Priority number Date
US201762575763 23.10.2017
US201715840040 13.12.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI870937B 21.01.2025B
TW202346229 01.12.2023A
Priority number Date
US201762575763 23.10.2017
US201715840040 13.12.2017