EP3700505 - MICRO ALTERNATING TANGENTIAL FLOW PERFUSION FILTER, PROCESS VESSEL, AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Repligen Corporation 41 Seyton Street Waltham, MA 02453 / US | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANSBY, Michael c/o Repligen Corporation 41 Seyon Street, Building 1, Suite 100 Waltham Massachusetts 02453 / US | 02 /
YUEN, Philip c/o Repligen Corporation 41 Seyon Street, Building 1, Suite 100 Waltham Massachusetts 02453 / US | [2020/41] |
Former [2020/36] | 01 /
BRANSBY, Michael 41 Seyon Street Waltham Massachusetts 02453 / US | ||
02 /
YUEN, Philip 41 Seyon Street Waltham Massachusetts 02453 / US | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 18871613.8 | 26.10.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018US57721 | Priority number, date | US201762577436P | 26.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762577436 P | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019084410 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3700505 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K35/00, B01D29/00, B01D61/14, C12M1/00 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
C12M29/10 (EP,US);
B01D61/147 (US);
B01D61/18 (US);
C12M29/04 (EP,US);
C12M33/14 (US);
B01D2311/16 (EP,US);
B01D2315/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/36] | A61K9/00, A61K35/00, B01D29/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Title | German: | KIKROALTERNIERENDEE TANGENTIALFLUSS-PERFUSIONSFILTER, PROZESSGEFÄSS UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/36] | English: | MICRO ALTERNATING TANGENTIAL FLOW PERFUSION FILTER, PROCESS VESSEL, AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2020/36] | French: | FILTRE DE PERFUSION À ÉCOULEMENT TANGENTIEL MICRO-ALTERNATIF, RÉCIPIENT DE TRAITEMENT, ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 09.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2012026978 (SHEVITZ JERRY [US]); | [XI]US2015247114 (GEBAUER KLAUS [SE]); | [XI]WO2017082990 (REPLIGEN CORP [US]) | International search | [Y]US2008281200 (VOIC DAN [US], et al); | [A]US2014011270 (CHOTTEAU VERONIQUE [SE], et al); | [XYA]US2015247114 (GEBAUER KLAUS [SE]); | [A]WO2017082990 (REPLIGEN CORP [US]) |