EP3704300 - REACTOR ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR PRE-HYDROLYSIS OF BIOMASS MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALMET AB 851 94 Sundsvall / SE | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMBERT, Francois Ljungbacken 8 854 60 Sundsvall / SE | 02 /
CARLSSON, Johan Smedsgårdsvägen 18 865 33 Alnö / SE | 03 /
BOMAN, Rolf Idrottsgatan 17 856 43 Sundsvall / SE | 04 /
PETTERSSON, Patrik Fullriggarvägen 43 865 32 Alnö / SE | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 18873855.3 | 30.10.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018SE51110 | Priority number, date | SE20170051351 | 31.10.2017 Original published format: SE 1751351 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019088906 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3704300 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D21C1/02, D21C1/04, B01J19/20, C12P7/10, C12P19/02, C13K1/02, D21C7/00 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
B01J19/20 (EP,SE,US);
B01J19/26 (US);
B01J4/002 (EP,US);
C13K1/02 (EP,SE,US);
D21C1/02 (EP,SE);
D21C1/04 (EP,SE);
D21C7/00 (EP,SE);
B01J2219/182 (EP);
B01J2219/1943 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Title | German: | REAKTORANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VORHYDROLYSE VON BIOMASSE | [2020/37] | English: | REACTOR ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR PRE-HYDROLYSIS OF BIOMASS MATERIAL | [2020/37] | French: | ARRANGEMENT DE RÉACTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉ-HYDROLYSE DE MATÉRIAU DE BIOMASSE | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 20.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 31.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US4592804 (NOREUS STURE [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,11-13,15 * figure 1 * * column 3, paragraphs 16-42 * * column 4, lines 12-14 * [A] 3-10 [Y] 14; | [YA]WO2014047097 (ANDRITZ INC [US]) [Y] 14 * paragraphs [0023] - [0025]; figure 1 * [A] 1-13,15; | [A]WO2016094594 (SWEETWATER ENERGY INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0029] , [0079]; figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0095] , [0096] , [0110] , [0203] *; | [A]WO2017136915 (IOGEN CORP [CA]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 3, 4 ** paragraphs [0000] , [0 14] , [0 51] , [0 57] , [0 86] , [0 92] * | International search | [A]US1106736 (SCHULER GEORGE [US]) [A] 1-15 * ; page 1, line 62 - line 65; figure 1 *; | [A]SU421725 (CELL-N) CELL-PAPER IND EQUIP DES) [A] 1-15 * ; abstract; figure 1 *; | [A]AT336992B (VISCH KHIM T I NIS [BG]) [A] 1-15* ; figure 3 *; | [A]US4592804 (NOREUS STURE [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * ; whole document *; | [XAY]WO2010009548 (SUNOPTA BIOPROCESS INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-5, 8-14 * ; abstract; page 6, line 15 -page 7, line 3; page 14, line 14 - line 19; page 16, line 22 -page 17, line 7; page 23, line 19 - line 20; page 24, line 3 - line 30; figures 2, 4 * [A] 6-7 [Y] 1-5, 8-15; | [YA]EP2500466 (ANDRITZ INC [US]) [Y] 1-5, 8-15 * ; paragraphs [0020], [0042]; figure 8 * [A] 6-7; | [A]WO2013041298 (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * ; paragraphs [0050], [0102]; figure 1 *; | [A]CN106868909 (YANG TAISONG) [A] 1-15 * ; abstract; figure 2 * |