EP3703556 - CUSTOMIZABLE PATCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LifeSignals, Inc. 39355 California Street Suite 303 Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGAR, Surendar 39355 California Street Suite 305 Fremont California 94538 / US | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/37] |
Former [2020/37] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18874368.6 | 30.10.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018US58290 | Priority number, date | US201762579309P | 31.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762579309 P | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019089652 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3703556 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3703556 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
A61B5/0022 (EP,US);
A61B5/6833 (EP,US);
A61B5/00 (EP);
A61B5/0205 (EP);
A61B5/02055 (US);
A61B5/112 (US);
A61B5/14542 (US);
A61B5/165 (US);
A61B5/4818 (US);
A61B5/4875 (US);
A61B5/681 (US);
A61B5/7264 (US);
A61B5/742 (US);
A61B7/04 (US);
G16H40/67 (EP);
A61B2503/04 (US);
A61B2503/08 (US);
A61B2503/40 (US);
A61B2560/0412 (EP);
A61B2560/0443 (US);
A61B2560/045 (EP);
A61B2562/0219 (US);
A61B5/02405 (US);
A61B5/0245 (US);
A61B5/0816 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANPASSBARE PFLASTER | [2020/37] | English: | CUSTOMIZABLE PATCHES | [2020/37] | French: | TIMBRES PERSONNALISABLES | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 17.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | LU | 30.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012030547 (RAPTIS MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0035] *; | [I]US2013060098 (THOMSEN ERIK V [DK], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0053] , [ 120] - [0126] - [ 170] - [0175] - [ 184] *; | [I]US2014213876 (BANET MATT [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0056] - [0061] * | International search | [A]US2008167535 (STIVORIC JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * , entire document. *; | [Y]US2009051544 (NIKNEJAD ALI [US]) [Y] 11 * , entire document, especially; para [0003]. *; | [A]US2011028814 (PETERSEN ETHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * , entire document. *; | [Y]US2011172545 (GRUDIC GREGORY ZLATKO [US], et al) [Y] 26 * ,entire document, especially; para [0011], [0030], [0031]. *; | [A]US2016029906 (TOMPKINS KIM [US], et al) [A] 1-29* , entire document. *; | [Y]US2017080207 (PEREZ RAUL E [US], et al) [Y] 4-9, 20-24, 26, 27 * , entire document, especially; para [0029], [0275], [0526], [0540], [0542], [0543], [0560], [0614], [0615], [0620], [0625], [0627]-[0629]. *; | [XY]US2017258402 (ACQUISTA ANGELO JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 10, 12-19, 25, 28, 29 * , entire document, especially; para [0007], [0008], [0011], [0013], [0040], [0041], [0044], [0045], [0047], [0050], [0059], [0060], [0061], [0076], [0083]. * [Y] 4-9, 11, 20-24, 26, 27 | by applicant | US2017258402 |