02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
19.07.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
20.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
01.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
11.08.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
02.08.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.08.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.08.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.04.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.10.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.01.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.10.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.07.2021 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
02.07.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
15.01.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
15.01.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
11.12.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.08.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
07.08.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
14.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
13.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.05.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|