EP3703560 - LIVING BODY DETECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vicwood Prosperity Technology Limited 19/F, 188 Des Voeux Road Central Hong Kong / HK | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Ka Wai Eric Department of Electrical Engineering The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Hung Hom Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
WONG, Kwok Shing 19/F, 188 Des Voeux Road Central Hong Kong / CN | 03 /
LAW, Man Yau 19/F, 188 Des Voeux Road Central Hong Kong / CN | 04 /
NG, Hin Hung 19/F, 188 Des Voeux Road Central Hong Kong / CN | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/37] | Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18874374.4 | 05.11.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018IB58653 | Priority number, date | HK20170111337 | 03.11.2017 Original published format: HK 17111337 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019087154 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3703560 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/053, H03K17/96 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
H03K17/9645 (EP,US);
A61B5/053 (EP);
A61B5/0531 (US);
G08B21/22 (US);
H02H3/36 (EP);
H02H5/12 (EP,US);
H01H83/22 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON LEBENDEN KÖRPERN | [2020/37] | English: | LIVING BODY DETECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2020/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION DE CORPS VIVANT | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 25.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/44] | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 25.08.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 25.08.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.09.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 25.08.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 25.08.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.09.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2022 | 30.11.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2011132129 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * line 11 - page 6, line 12; figure 1 * * line 11 - page 7, line 12 * * figures 3,4 * * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 6 *; | [Y]WO2016174644 (ETON SOLUTIONS LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0013]; figure 2C * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] *; | [A] - Abdellah Ouazani ET AL, "The Electric Impedance of the Human Body", (20131007), URL: http://psrcentre.org/images/extraimages/7%201013005.pdf, (20180404), XP055464494 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [PX]WO2018083637 (VICWOOD PROSPERITY TECH LIMITED [CN]) [PX] 1-16 * description, paragraphs [0048]-[0118] *; | [A]CN102859875 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV) [A] 1-16 * description,paragraphs [0034]-[0062] and figures 1-6 *; | [A]CN1544959 (UNIV ZHEJIANG [CN]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004215853 (MARX ELLIOT [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]CN203314960U (FUJIAN PROVINCIAL ACADEMY OF TRADITIONAL CHINESE MEDICINE) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]CN107157481 (HUNAN OCEANWING E-COMMERCE CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2011132129 |