EP3710419 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF 2,3,3,3-TETRAFLUOROPROPENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema France 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLIER, Bertrand 16 rue Edme Piot 21500 Montbard / FR | 02 /
DEUR-BERT, Dominique 284F Chemin du Montellier 69390 Charly / FR | 03 /
PIGAMO, Anne 9 rue de la Chapelle de Bel Air 69340 Francheville / FR | 04 /
WENDLINGER, Laurent 18 Hameau des Pierres Blanches 69510 Soucieu En Jarrest / FR | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 18875016.0 | 08.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018FR52777 | Priority number, date | FR20170060635 | 13.11.2017 Original published format: FR 1760635 | [2020/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019092376 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3710419 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/20, C07C17/25, C07C21/18 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
C07C17/25 (EP,US);
B01J23/26 (US);
C07C17/206 (EP,US);
C07C21/18 (US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/206, C07C21/18 (EP);
C07C17/25, C07C21/18 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2,3,3,3-TETRAFLUORPROPEN | [2020/39] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF 2,3,3,3-TETRAFLUOROPROPENE | [2020/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DU 2,3,3,3-TETRAFLUOROPROPENE | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 22.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]FR3012137 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]) [I] 1-10* page 11, line 4 - page 14, line 4; figure 1; example 1 *; | [I]US2015203421 (TAKAHASHI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0040] , [0044]; figure 1; examples 1-9 * | by applicant | US2009240090 | WO2013088195 |