EP3707240 - STEM CELLS AND DEVICES FOR BONE REGENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Southern California USC Stevens Center for Innovation 1150 South Olive Street, Suite 2300 Los Angeles, CA 90015 / US | [2024/08] |
Former [2020/38] | For all designated states Alfred E. Mann Institute for Biomedical Engineering at the University of Southern California 1042 Downey Way, DRB 101 Los Angeles, CA 90089-1112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAI, Yang c/o Alfred E. Mann Institute for Biomedical Engineering at the University of Southern California 1042 Downey Way, DRB 101 Los Angeles California 90089 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Yong c/o Alfred E. Mann Institute for Biomedical Engineering at the University of Southern California 1042 Downey Way, DRB 101 Los Angeles California 90089 / US | 03 /
YUAN, Yuan c/o Alfred E. Mann Institute for Biomedical Engineering at the University of Southern California 1042 Downey Way, DRB 101 Los Angeles California 90089 / US | 04 /
GUO, Yuxing c/o Alfred E. Mann Institute for Biomedical Engineering at the University of Southern California 1042 Downey Way, DRB 101 Los Angeles California 90089 / US | 05 /
LI, Xiangjia c/o Alfred E. Mann Institute for Biomedical Engineering at the University of Southern California 1042 Downey Way, DRB 101 Los Angeles California 90089 / US | 06 /
JOHNSON, Zoe c/o Alfred E. Mann Institute for Biomedical Engineering at the University of Southern California 1042 Downey Way, DRB 101 Los Angeles California 90089 / US | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 18875376.8 | 08.11.2018 | [2020/38] | WO2018US59860 | Priority number, date | US201762584052P | 09.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762584052 P | [2020/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019094617 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3707240 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3707240 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/07, A61L27/12, A61L27/38, A61F2/28, A61L27/18, A61L27/46, A61L27/54 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L27/3834 (EP,US);
A61F2/28 (EP,US);
A61L27/12 (EP);
A61L27/18 (EP);
A61L27/3847 (EP,US);
A61L27/46 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (US);
A61F2002/2817 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2835 (EP,US);
A61F2002/285 (EP,US);
A61L2300/204 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L67/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/38] | C12N5/07 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAMMZELLEN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR KNOCHENREGENERATION | [2020/38] | English: | STEM CELLS AND DEVICES FOR BONE REGENERATION | [2020/38] | French: | CELLULES SOUCHES ET DISPOSITIFS DE RÉGÉNÉRATION OSSEUSE | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 11.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012271418 (HOLLISTER SCOTT J [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 20]; claims 1, 9 * * paragraphs [0080] , [0 96] ** paragraphs [0117] , [ 126] *; | [XI]US2013236513 (GUELCHER SCOTT A [US], et al) [X] 9,10,12 * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0184] , [ 187] * * examples 1, 9 * [I] 11,13; | [X]US8916228 (OH DANIEL SUNHO [US], et al) [X] 9 * claims 12, 16, 19 * * figures 1, 2, 15 * * column 8 * * column 16, line 48 - column 17, line 25 * * column 27, lines 16-30 *; | [X]US9707322 (NUKAVARAPU SYAM P [US], et al) [X] 9,10 * claim 1 * * figure 4 * * column 21 - column 22; table 1 * * column 7, line 62 - column 8, line 12 * * column 32, lines 15-40 *; | [A] - JINLING MA ET AL, "Concise Review: Cell-Based Strategies in Bone Tissue Engineering and Regenerative Medicine", STEM CELLS TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, US, (20131203), vol. 3, no. 1, doi:10.5966/sctm.2013-0126, ISSN 2157-6564, pages 98 - 107, XP055476106 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph "Cocultures"; page 102 * * pparagraph "Conclusions"; page 103 - page 105 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5966/sctm.2013-0126 | International search | [Y]US2012219535 (MAXSON JR ROBERT E [US], et al) [Y] 123* abstract, para [0058] *; | [XY]US2012271418 (HOLLISTER SCOTT J [US], et al) [X] 82-89, 99-101, 112-115 * abstract, para [0006], [0013], [0014], [0015], [0027], [0124], * [Y] 1-3, 8-13, 20-22, 31-33, 42-44, 53-64, 71-81, 102- 105, 116-123; | [Y]US2016135955 (HENDERSON JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 61-64, 102-105, 123/(61- 64, 102-105) * abstract, para [0037] *; | [Y]US2016184190 (YOUNG ANNE MARGARET [GB]) [Y] 1-3, 8-13, 20-22, 31-33, 42-44, 53-64, 71-81, 116- 122, 123/(1-3, 8-13, 20-22, 31-33, 42-44, 53-64, 71- 81, 116-122) * abstract, para [0014], [0191], [0192], [0401], * | by applicant | US6454811 | US2005272153 | US7968026 | US2012128636 | US8275594 | US2013330300 | US2014154220 | US8895046 | US2014363481 | US8916288 | WO2014210037 | US2015039097 | WO2015038665 | US2015104428 | US2016058911 | US2016095958 | US2016184480 | US9550012 | - JIANG YJAHAGIRDAR BNREINHARDT RLSCHWARTZ REKEENE CDORTIZ-GONZALEZ XRREYES MLENVIK TLUND TBLACKSTAD M, "Pluripotency of mesenchymal stem cells derived from adult marrow", Nature, (20020000), vol. 418, no. 6893, doi:10.1038/nature00870, pages 41 - 49, XP002559664 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature00870 | - ARAI, K., TOH, S., TSUBO, K., NISHIKAWA, S., NARITA, S., MIURA, H., Plast Reconstr Surg, (20020000), vol. 109, pages 2301 - 6 | - SALERNO, A.DIEGUEZ, S.DIAZ-GOMEZ, L.GOMEZ-AMOZA, J. L.MAGARINOS, B.CONCHEIRO, A.GARCIA-GONZALEZ, C. A, Biofabrication, (20170000), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 025037 - 85 | - BITEAU BHOCHMUTH CEJASPER H, "Maintaining tissue homeostasis: dynamic control of somatic stem cell activity", Cell stem cell, (20110000), vol. 9, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.stem.2011.10.004, pages 402 - 411, XP028104358 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.stem.2011.10.004 | - BOCCACCINI, A. R.TRUSTY, P. A., Materials characterization, (19980000), vol. 41, no. 4, pages 109 - 121 | - SURNAME ASURNAME B, Journal Name, (20090000), vol. 23, page 544 | - BOSE, S.VAHABZADEH, S.BANDYOPADHYAY, A., Materials today, (20130000), vol. 16, no. 12, pages 496 - 504 | - CASTILHO, M.MOSEKE, C.EWALD, A.GBURECK, U.GROLL, J.PIRES, I.VORNDRAN, E, Biofabrication, (20140000), vol. 6, no. 2, page 025001 | - CHUNG, I. H., YAMAZA, T., ZHAO, H., CHOUNG, P. H., SHI, S., CHAI, Y., Stem Cells, (20090000), vol. 27, pages 866 - 77 | - COOPER GM, MOONEY MP, GOSAIN AK, CAMPBELL PG, LOSEE JE, HUARD J, "Testing the critical size in calvarial bone defects: revisiting the concept of a critical-size defect", Plast Reconstr Surg, (20100600), vol. 125, no. 6, pages 1685 - 92 | - COX, S. C., THORNBY, J. A., GIBBONS, G. J., WILLIAMS, M. A., MALLICK, K. K., Materials Science and Engineering: C, (20150000), vol. 47, pages 237 - 247 | - DE BOER, H. H.WOOD, M. B.HERMANS, J., Int Orthop, (19900000), vol. 14, pages 121 - 8 | - DENG, X. G.WANG, J. K.ZHANG, H. J.LIU, J. H.ZHAO, W. G.HUANG, Z.ZHANG, S. W., Advances in Applied Ceramics, (20160000), vol. 115, no. 4, pages 204 - 209 | - DI LUCA, A.LONGONI, A.CRISCENTI, G.MOTA, C.VAN BLITTERSWIJK, C.MORONI, L, Biofabrication, (20160000), vol. 8, no. 4, page 045007 | - FRISCH, URIELBROSL HASSLACHERYVES POMEAU, Physical review letters, (19860000), vol. 56, no. 14, page 1505 | - GRIFFITH, MICHELLE L.JOHN W. HALLORAN, Journal of the American Ceramic Society, (19960000), vol. 79, no. 10, pages 2601 - 2608 | - HEUNISCH, A.DELLERT, A.ROOSEN, A., Journal of the European Ceramic Society, (20100000), vol. 30, no. 16, pages 3397 - 3406 | - HO, C. M. B.NG, S. H.YOON, Y. J., International Journal of Precision Engineering and Manufacturing, (20150000), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 1035 - 1046 | - HOLLISTER, S. J., Advanced materials, (20090000), vol. 21, no. 32-33, pages 3330 - 3342 | - HOLMES, B.BULUSU, K.PLESNIAK, M.ZHANG, L. G, Nanotechnology, (20160000), vol. 27, no. 6, page 064001 | - JORDAN, M. M.MONTERO, M. A.MESEGUER, S.SANFELIU, T., Applied Clay Science, (20080000), vol. 42, no. 1-2, pages 266 - 271 | - KIM, J.MCBRIDE, S.TELLIS, B.ALVAREZ-URENA, P.SONG, Y. H.DEAN, D. D.HOLLINGER, J. O., Biofabrication, (20120000), vol. 4, no. 2, page 025003 | - SATO, M.SAMBITO, M. A.ASLANI, A.KALKHORAN, N. M.SLAMOVICH, E. B.WEBSTER, T. J., Biomaterials, (20060000), vol. 27, no. 11, pages 2358 - 2369 | - KON, E.MURAGLIA, A.CORSI, A.BIANCO, P.MARCACCI, M.MARTIN, I.GIARDINO, R., Journal of Biomedical Materials Research: An Official Journal of The Society for Biomaterials and The Japanese Society for Biomaterials, (20000000), vol. 49, no. 3, pages 328 - 337 | - LEE, K. S.HAN, S. B.BAEK, J. R., J Reconstr Microsurg, (20040000), vol. 20, pages 277 - 84 | - LEUCHT, P., KIM, J. B., AMASHA, R., JAMES, A. W., GIROD, S., HELMS, J. A., Development, (20080000), vol. 135, pages 2845 - 54 | - LEUKERS, B.GULKAN, H.IRSEN, S. H.MILZ, S.TILLE, C.SCHIEKER, M.SEITZ, H, Journal of Materials Science: Materials in Medicine, (20050000), vol. 16, no. 12, pages 1121 - 1124 | - LI, X.CHEN, Y., Journal of Manufacturing Processes, (20170000), vol. 28, pages 531 - 540 | - LI, X.XIE, B.JIN, J.CHAI, Y.CHEN, Y., Procedia Manufacturing, (20180000), vol. 26, pages 1023 - 1033 | - LI, Y.ZHAO, S.NAN, X.WEI, H.SHI, J.LI, A.GOU, J., Stem Cell Research & Therapy, (20160000), vol. 7, page 141 | - LIM, K. S.LEVATO, R.COSTA, P. F.CASTILHO, M. D.ALCALA-OROZCO, C. R.VAN DORENMALEN, K. M.WOODFIELD, T. B., Biofabrication, (20180000), vol. 10, no. 3, page 034101 | - LIU, Y.WANG, L.KIKUIRI, T.AKIYAMA, K.CHEN, C.XU, X.YANG, R.CHEN, W.WANG, S.SHI, S., Nat Med, (20110000), vol. 17, pages 1594 - 601 | - MACCHETTA, A.TURNER, I. G.BOWEN, C. R., Acta Biomaterialia, (20090000), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 1319 - 1327 | - MARDAS NKOSTOPOULOS LKARRING T, "Bone and suture regeneration in calvarial defects by e-PTFE-membranes and demineralized bone matrix and the impact on calvarial growth: an experimental study in the rat", J Craniofac Surg, (20020500), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 453 - 62 | - MIAO, X.TAN, D. M.LI, J.XIAO, Y.CRAWFORD, R., Acta Biomaterialia, (20080000), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 638 - 645 | - MINAMI, A.KASASHIMA, T.IWASAKI, N.KATO, H.KANEDA, K, J Bone Joint Surg Br, (20000000), vol. 82, pages 1022 - 5 | - NADEEM, D.SMITH, C. A.DALBY, M. J.MEEK, R. D.LIN, S.LI, G.SU, B, Biofabrication, (20150000), vol. 7, no. 1, page 015005 | - NG ZYNAWAZ I, "Computer-designed PEEK implants: a peek into the future of cranioplasty?", J Craniofac Surg, (20140100), vol. 25, no. 1, pages e55 - 8 | - NYBERG, E.RINDONE, A.DORAFSHAR, A.GRAYSON, W. L, Tissue Engineering Part A, (20170000), vol. 23, no. 11-12, pages 503 - 514 | - PAN, Y.ZHOU C.CHEN, Y., ASME Journal of Manufacturing Science and Engineering, (20120000), vol. 134, no. 5, page 051011 | - PARK SZHAO HURATA MCHAI Y, "Sutures Possess Strong Regenerative Capacity for Calvarial Bone Injury", Stem Cells Dev, (20161024), vol. 25, no. 23, pages 1801 - 1807 | - PETIT, R, European Journal of Orthopaedic Surgery & Traumatology, (19990000), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 71 - 74 | - QIN, Y.GUAN, J.ZHANG, C., Postgrad Med J, (20140000), vol. 90, pages 643 - 7 | - RICE, R. W., Journal of materials science, (19930000), vol. 28, no. 8, pages 2187 - 2190 | - RENGIER, F.MEHNDIRATTA, A.VON TENGG-KOBLIGK, H.ZECHMANN, C. M.UNTERHINNINGHOFEN, R.KAUCZOR, H. U.GIESEL, F. L., International journal of computer assisted radiology and surgery, (20100000), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 335 - 341 | - SONG, X.CHEN, Y.LEE, T.WU, SH.CHENG, L., SME Journal of Manufacturing Processes, (20150000), vol. 20, pages 456 - 464 | - SONG, X.CHEN, Z.LEI, L.SHUNG, K.ZHOU,Q.CHEN, Y., Rapid Prototyping Journal, (20170000), vol. 23, no. 1 | - SONG, X.ZHANG, Z.CHEN, Z.CHEN, Y., ASME Journal of Manufacturing Science and Engineering, (20160000), vol. 139, no. 3, page 031015 | - SOUCACOS, P. N., KOROMPILIAS, A. V., VEKRIS, M. D., ZOUBOS, A., AND BERIS, A. E., Microsurgery, (20110000), vol. 31, pages 190 - 7 | - SPONER, P.KUCERA, T.DIAZ-GARCIA, D.FILIP, S., Eur J Orthop Surg Traumatol, (20140000), vol. 24, pages 257 - 62 | - STEVENSON, S, ClinOrthopRelat Res, (19980000), pages 239 - 46 | - TROMBETTA, R.INZANA, J. A.SCHWARZ, E. M.KATES, S. L.AWAD, H. A, Annals of biomedical engineering, (20170000), vol. 45, no. 1, pages 23 - 44 | - WANG, Q.XU, J.JIN, H.ZHENG, W.ZHANG, X.HUANG, Y.QIAN, Z., Chinese Chemical Letters, (20170000), vol. 28, no. 9, pages 1801 - 1807 | - WU, C.XIA, L.HAN, P.XU, M.FANG, B.WANG, J.XIAO, Y, Carbon, (20150000), vol. 93, pages 116 - 129 | - XU, K.KWOK, T.ZHAO ZH.CHEN, Y., ASME Journal of Computing and Information Science in Engineering, (20170000), vol. 17, no. 2, page 021009 | - YANG, J. Z.HU, X. Z.SULTANA, R.DAY, R. E.ICHIM, P, Biomedical Materials, (20150000), vol. 10, no. 4, page 045006 | - YANG, Y.SONG, X.LI, X.CHEN, Z.ZHOU, C.ZHOU, Q.CHEN, Y, Advanced Materials, (20180000), vol. 30, no. 9, page 1706539 | - YE LISHU-KUI CHENLONG LILING QINXIN-LUAN WANGYU-XIAO LAI, "Bone defect animal models for testing efficacy of bone substitute biomaterials", Journal of Orthopaedic Translation, vol. 3, (20150700), pages 95 - 104, URL: https://doi.org/10.1016/j.jot.2015.05.002 | - ZENG, Y.YAN, Y.YAN, H.LIU, C.LI, P.DONG, P.CHEN, J, Journal of Materials Science, (20180000), vol. 53, no. 9, pages 6291 - 6301 | - ZHAO HFENG JHO TVGRIMES WURATA MCHAI Y, "The suture provides a niche for mesenchymal stem cells of craniofacial bones", Nat Cell Biol, (20150323), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 386 - 96 | - ZHOU, C.CHEN, Y.WALTZ, R. A., Journal of Manufacturing Science and Engineering, (20090000), vol. 131, no. 6, page 061004 | - ZHOU, C.CHEN, Y.YANG, Z.KHOSHNEVIS, B., Rapid Prototyping Journal, (20130000), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 153 - 165 | - ZISSI, S.BERTSCH, A.JEZEQUEL, J. Y.CORBEL, S.LOUGNOT, D. J.ANDRE, J. C., Microsystem technologies, (19960000), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 97 - 102 | - EGUSA et al., "Stem Cells in Dentistry - Part I: Stem Cell Sources", J. Prosthodontic Res., vol. 56, no. 212, doi:10.1016/j.jpor.2012.06.001, pages 151 - 165, XP028933250 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpor.2012.06.001 | - ATSUTA et al., "Mesenchymal stem cells inhibit multiple myeloma cells via the Fas/Fas ligand pathway", Stem Cell Research & Therapy, (20130000), vol. 4, doi:10.1186/scrt322, page 111, XP021162905 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/scrt322 | - GRONTHOS et al., "Postnatal human dental pulp stem cells (DPSCs) in vitro and in vivo", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20000000), vol. 97, doi:10.1073/pnas.240309797, pages 13625 - 13630, XP002201506 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.240309797 | - MIURA et al., "SHED: stem cells from human exfoliated deciduous teeth", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20030000), vol. 100, doi:10.1073/pnas.0937635100, pages 5807 - 5812, XP002279268 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0937635100 | - YAMAZA et al., "Immunomodulatory properties of stem cells from human exfoliated deciduous teeth", Stem Cell Res. Ther., (20110000), vol. 1, pages 5 - 14 | - SEO et al., "Investigation of multipotent postnatal stem cells from human periodontal ligament", Lancet, (20040000), vol. 364, doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(04)16627-0, pages 149 - 155, XP005070189 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(04)16627-0 | - MORSCZECK et al., "Isolation of precursor cells (PCs) from human dental follicle of wisdom teeth", Matrix Biol, (20050000), vol. 24, doi:10.1016/j.matbio.2004.12.004, pages 155 - 65, XP025300235 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matbio.2004.12.004 | - CHUNG et al., "Stem Cell Property of Postmigratory Cranial Neural Crest Cells and Their Utility in Alveolar Bone Regeneration and Tooth Development", Stem Cells, (20090400), vol. 27, no. 4, doi:10.1002/stem.2, pages 866 - 877, XP002576253 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/stem.2 | - ZHAO et al., "The suture provides a niche for mesenchymal stem cells of craniofacial bones", Nature Cell Biology, (20150400), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 386 - 396 | - DEVESCOVI, V et al., "Growth factors in bone repair", Chir Organi Mov, (20080000), vol. 92, page 161 | - JAMES A. W., "Review of Signaling Pathways Governing MSC Osteogenic and Adipogenic Differentiation", Scientifica (Cairo, (20130000), vol. 2013, page 684736 | - CAROFINO B. C. et al., "Gene therapy applications for fracture healing", J Bone Joint Surg Am, (20080000), vol. 90, pages 99 - 110 | - JAVED A. et al., "Genetic and transcriptional control of bone formation", Oral Maxillofac Surg Clin North Am, (20100000), vol. 22, pages 283 - 93 | - CHEN G. et al., "TGF-β and BMP signaling in osteoblast differentiation and bone formation", Int. J. Biol. Sci., (20120000), vol. 8, pages 272 - 288 | - ORNITZ, D. M. et al., "FGF signaling pathways in endochondral and intramembranous bone development and human genetic disease", Genes Dev, (20020000), vol. 16, doi:10.1101/gad.990702, pages 1446 - 1465, XP009109542 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.990702 | - KRISHNAN V et al., "Regulation of bone mass by Wnt signaling", J. Clin. Invest., (20060000), vol. 116, doi:10.1172/JCI28551, pages 1202 - 1209, XP055088452 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI28551 | - BOYCE B. F. et al., "Functions of RANKL/RANK/OPG in bone modeling and remodeling", Arch Biochem Biophys., (20080000), vol. 473, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.abb.2008.03.018, pages 139 - 146, XP022668167 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.abb.2008.03.018 | - CAO et al., "Selective Small Molecule Compounds Increase BMP-2 Responsiveness by Inhibiting Smurf1-mediated Smad1/5 Degradation", Nature, Scientific Reports, (20140514), vol. 4, page 4965 |