Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7438108B | Global Dossier | 26.02.2024 | B2 | JP2021502644 | 28.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201711100015 | 09.11.2017 | WO2018CN114848 | 09.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3709255 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2021 | A4 | EP3709255 | 16.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201711100015 | 09.11.2017 | WO2018CN114848 | 09.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019091459 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201711100015 | 09.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10430683 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2019 | B2 | US2019138838 | 09.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201711100015 | 09.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107767343B | Global Dossier | 31.08.2021 | B | CN107767343 | 06.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201711100015 | 09.11.2017 |