EP3709255 - IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, PROCESSING APPARATUS AND PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Hanwen No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
NAVARRETE MICHELINI, Pablo No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/38] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18876502.8 | 09.11.2018 | [2020/38] | WO2018CN114848 | Priority number, date | CN201711100015 | 09.11.2017 Original published format: CN201711100015 | [2020/38] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019091459 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3709255 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/40, G06T5/00, G06T11/00 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
G06T11/00 (EP,US);
G06T3/4053 (EP,CN,US);
G06N3/02 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/047 (EP);
G06N3/08 (EP);
G06T5/60 (EP);
G06T5/70 (EP,CN,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
H04N7/0117 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10024 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/38] | G06T3/40, G06T5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, VERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/38] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, PROCESSING APPARATUS AND PROCESSING DEVICE | [2020/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2020 | Translation filed | 29.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 11.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]CN107122826 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [Y] 1,2,4-6,9-11,15 * abstract * * figures 2,3A-C * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0072] * [A] 3,7,8,12-14; | [YA] - LEON GATYS ET AL, "A Neural Algorithm of Artistic Style", JOURNAL OF VISION, US, (20160901), vol. 16, no. 12, doi:10.1167/16.12.326, ISSN 1534-7362, pages 1 - 16, XP055571235 [Y] 1,2,4-6,9-11,15 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph LAST * * page 10, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 2 * [A] 3,7,8,12-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1167/16.12.326 | [A] - XUN HUANG ET AL, "Arbitrary Style Transfer in Real-time with Adaptive Instance Normalization", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20170320), doi:10.1109/ICCV.2017.167, XP080758365 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 2 * * section 6.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2017.167 |