EP3712211 - TWO-STEP CURABLE THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE SILICONE COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Polymer Industries Co., Ltd. 21-11, Chiyoda 5-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 460-0012 / JP | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUMURA Katsuyuki c/o Fuji Polymer Industries Co., Ltd. Aichi Factory 175, Kajiyashiki-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 470-0533 / JP | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 18877955.7 | 15.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018JP42337 | Priority number, date | JP20170222098 | 17.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017222098 | [2020/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019098290 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3712211 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/06, C08J5/18, C08K3/00, C08K5/14, C08L83/05, C08L83/07, H01L23/36, H01L23/373 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
C08J3/244 (EP);
C08G77/08 (US);
C08G77/12 (EP,US);
C08G77/20 (EP,US);
C08G77/50 (US);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08J7/08 (US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (US);
C08K5/14 (EP,US);
C09D183/04 (EP);
H01L23/373 (US);
H01L23/3737 (EP);
C08J2383/04 (EP);
C08J2383/14 (US);
C08J3/243 (US);
C08K2003/2227 (EP,US);
C08K2201/001 (US);
C08K2201/014 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08K3/20, C08L83/00 (EP);
C08L83/04, C08K3/22, C08L83/00 (EP);
C08L83/04, C08K5/14, C08L83/00 (EP);
C08L83/04, C08K5/56, C08L83/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | ZWEISTUFIG HÄRTBARE WÄRMELEITFÄHIGE SILIKONZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/39] | English: | TWO-STEP CURABLE THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE SILICONE COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2020/39] | French: | COMPOSITION DE SILICONE THERMIQUEMENT CONDUCTRICE DURCISSABLE EN DEUX ÉTAPES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2019 | Translation filed | 08.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 25.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/26] | 15.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3643498 (FUJI POLYMER IND [JP]) [E] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2014124367 (DOW CORNING [US]) [X] 1-8,10-12 * abstract * * page 3 * * page 14, paragraph 42 * * page 64, paragraph 212 * * sections A-C; pages 69-70 * * page 71; table 5 * * page 72, paragraph 232 * * page 72, paragraph 229 - page 73, paragraph 233 * [I] 9; | [IA]EP0465906 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [I] 1 * page 3, lines 22-43 * * page 6; example 2 * [A] 2-12; | [A]EP1342747 (POLYMATECH CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [XY]JP2017075218 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1-9 [Y] 10; | [Y]JP2010013521 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 10; | [Y]JP2013147600 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 1-10; | [Y]WO2016160750 (ROGERS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-10; | [A]WO2016103654 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10; | [A]JPH05140456 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-10 | by applicant | JP2005068273 | JP2014065272 |