EP3710809 - CLASSIFICATION OF A POPULATION OF OBJECTS BY CONVOLUTIONAL DICTIONARY LEARNING WITH CLASS PROPORTION DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states miDiagnostics NV Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Vidal, Rene Clark Hall 302B 3400 N. Charles Street Baltimore, Maryland 21218 / US | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIDAL, Rene Clark Hall 203B 3400 N. Charles St. Baltimore MD 21218 / US | 02 /
YELLIN, Florence 2515 St. Paul Street 5 Baltimore MD 21228 / US | 03 /
HAEFFELE, Benjamin 719 54th St. Apt. 7 Oakland CA 94609 / US | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 18877995.3 | 14.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018US61153 | Priority number, date | US201762585872P | 14.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762585872 P | US201862679757P | 01.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862679757 P | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019099592 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3710809 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/02, G01N15/14, G03H1/04, G06K9/00, G06K9/20, G06K9/32, G06K9/62 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
G01N15/1433 (EP,US);
G03H1/0005 (US);
G03H1/0443 (EP,US);
G06F18/2431 (US);
G06V10/147 (EP,US);
G06V10/25 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V20/52 (EP,US);
G06V20/698 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1454 (EP);
G03H2001/005 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/39] | G01N15/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | KLASSIFIZIERUNG EINER POPULATION VON OBJEKTEN DURCH FALTUNGSWÖRTERBUCHLERNEN MIT KLASSENVERHÄLTNISDATEN | [2020/39] | English: | CLASSIFICATION OF A POPULATION OF OBJECTS BY CONVOLUTIONAL DICTIONARY LEARNING WITH CLASS PROPORTION DATA | [2020/39] | French: | CLASSIFICATION D'UNE POPULATION D'OBJETS PAR APPRENTISSAGE DE DICTIONNAIRE CONVOLUTIF AVEC DES DONNÉES DE PROPORTION DE CLASSE | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 08.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/29] | 01.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2788737 (IMEC [BE], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0107] ** paragraph [0174] - paragraph [0176] *; | [Y]US2017132450 (EL-ZEHIRY NOHA [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0069] * * figures 6, 8A, 14 * | International search | [Y]US2017132450 (EL-ZEHIRY NOHA [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document (especially abstract, para [0007]-[0008], [0033]-[0034], [0046]-[0048], [0051]-[0053], [0055]-[0056], [0069]) *; | [Y]US2017212028 (CORREIA DE MATOS NOLASCO LAMAS FRANCISCO [PT], et al) [Y] 1-20* entire document (especially para [0020]-[0021], [0035], [0065], [0071], [0170]-[0171], [0188]-[0189], [0242]-[0244]). * |