EP3628655 - METHOD FOR DECOMPOSING BYPRODUCT OF PHENOL PRODUCTION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Minsuk LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Sang Beom LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Sung Ho LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
SHIN, Joon Ho LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Sangeun LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon34122 / KR | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/14] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18878649.5 | 17.08.2018 | [2020/14] | WO2018KR09462 | Priority number, date | KR20170154970 | 20.11.2017 Original published format: KR 20170154970 | [2020/14] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019098502 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3628655 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3628655 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C37/52, C07C39/04, C07C1/20, C07C15/085, C07C15/44, C07C45/82, C07C49/78 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
C07C1/20 (EP);
C07C37/74 (KR,US);
B01D3/009 (US);
B01D3/143 (US);
C07C15/085 (KR);
C07C37/52 (EP);
C07C39/04 (KR);
C07C45/82 (EP,US);
C07C7/04 (KR,US);
Y02P20/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C1/20, C07C15/085 (EP);
C07C1/20, C07C15/44 (EP);
C07C37/52, C07C39/04 (EP);
C07C45/82, C07C49/78 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/14] | C07C37/74, C07C7/04, C07C39/04, C07C15/085 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZERSETZUNG EINES NEBENPRODUKTS EINES PHENOLPRODUKTIONSPROZESSES | [2020/14] | English: | METHOD FOR DECOMPOSING BYPRODUCT OF PHENOL PRODUCTION PROCESS | [2020/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCOMPOSITION D'UN SOUS-PRODUIT GÉNÉRÉ DANS UN PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PHÉNOL | [2020/14] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2019 | Translation filed | 24.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/14] | 21.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | IE | 17.08.2023 | LU | 17.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
IE | 17.08.2023 | ||
LU | 17.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 17.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 17.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 17.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 17.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 17.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE1105878 (PHENOLCHEMIE GES MIT BESCHRAEN) [X] 1,2,5-11 * column 4, lines 6-25 * * column 5, lines 46-59; figure . * * column 6, lines 11-21 * [A] 3,13; | [XI]US3850996 (NIXON J) [X] 1,4,7,9,10,12 * columns 3-5; figure .; table . *[I] 5,6; | [XAI]EP0168358 (ANIC SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,7-11 * page 7, line 13 - page 8, line 9; figure 1 * [A] 3,13 [I] 5,6 | International search | [A]US3850996 (NIXON J) [A] 1-13 * See the entire document. *; | [Y]US4246203 (WIRTH MAX M) [Y] 1-13 * See column 1, lines 7-9; and column 4, lines 39-46. *; | [Y]KR0161038B (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-13 * See pages 2, 4; and figure 1. *; | [Y]KR100262026B (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-13 * See claims 1-10. *; | [A]KR100665764B (SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.) [A] 1-13* See the entire document. * | Examination | EP3680226 |