Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3713136
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.11.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
05.07.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.03.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.03.2023 |
First examination report |
|
25.11.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.01.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.11.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2021 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
27.08.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
27.08.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
22.01.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
22.01.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
23.11.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.08.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
21.08.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
28.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.06.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.06.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.06.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
15.06.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|