Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019098768 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862630844 | 15.02.2018 | US201862617120 | 12.01.2018 | US201762587495 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11540191 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2022 | B2 | US2021176687 | 10.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862739007 | 28.09.2018 | WO2018KR14133 | 16.11.2018 | US201816762907 | 16.11.2018 | US201762587495 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10945253 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2021 | B2 | US2019223163 | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018KR14132 | 16.11.2018 | US201862630844 | 15.02.2018 | US201916356888 | 18.03.2019 | US201862617120 | 12.01.2018 | US201762587495 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10791550 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2020 | B2 | US2019289530 | 19.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018KR14132 | 16.11.2018 | US201862630844 | 15.02.2018 | US201816318086 | 16.11.2018 | US201862617120 | 12.01.2018 | US201762587495 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102163926B | Global Dossier | 12.10.2020 | B1 | KR20190060747 | 03.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862630844 | 15.02.2018 | US201862617120 | 12.01.2018 | US201762587495 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101999702B | Global Dossier | 12.07.2019 | B1 | KR20190057002 | 27.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862630844 | 15.02.2018 | US201862617120 | 12.01.2018 | US201762587495 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7177832B | Global Dossier | 24.11.2022 | B2 | JP2021503795 | 12.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862739007 | 28.09.2018 | WO2018KR14133 | 16.11.2018 | US201762587495 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6974482B | Global Dossier | 01.12.2021 | B2 | JP2020507999 | 12.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018KR14132 | 16.11.2018 | US201862630844 | 15.02.2018 | US201862617120 | 12.01.2018 | US201762587495 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3515123 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2022 | B1 | EP3515123 | 13.05.2020 | A4 | EP3515123 | 24.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018KR14132 | 16.11.2018 | US201862630844 | 15.02.2018 | US201862617120 | 12.01.2018 | US201762587495 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111557081B | Global Dossier | 23.05.2023 | B | CN111557081 | 18.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862739007 | 28.09.2018 | WO2018KR14133 | 16.11.2018 | US201762587495 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110603852B | Global Dossier | 08.10.2021 | B | CN110603852 | 20.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018KR14132 | 16.11.2018 | US201862630844 | 15.02.2018 | US201862617120 | 12.01.2018 | US201762587495 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3713136 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2021 | A4 | EP3713136 | 23.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862739007 | 28.09.2018 | WO2018KR14133 | 16.11.2018 | US201762587495 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019098769 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862739007 | 28.09.2018 | US201762587495 | 17.11.2017 |