EP3710101 - ELECTROCHEMICAL REDUCTION OF UNWANTED DEPOSITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osteolyse, Inc. 1905 1/2 Virginia Street Berkeley, CA 94709 / US | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEXLER, Emily, Louise 1905 1/2 Virginia Street Berkeley CA 94709 / US | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18878772.5 | 16.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018US61652 | Priority number, date | US201762588204P | 17.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762588204 P | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019099924 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3710101 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/20, A61N1/32, A61N1/36 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
A61N1/20 (EP,US);
A61N1/0502 (EP,US);
A61N1/0496 (EP,US);
A61N1/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHE REDUKTION UNERWÜNSCHTER ABLAGERUNGEN | [2020/39] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL REDUCTION OF UNWANTED DEPOSITS | [2020/39] | French: | RÉDUCTION ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE DE DÉPÔTS INDÉSIRABLES | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 23.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007060989 (DEEM MARK E [US], et al); | [X]US2013345782 (KAMBOURIS AMBROSIOS MINAS [AU]); | [X]WO2015138915 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]); | [X]US2016375240 (YANAKI JAMAL [US], et al); | [X]US2017231559 (CUEVAS WALTER [US], et al) | International search | [A]US3842841 (BRIGHTON C, et al) [A] 1-15* ; entire document. *; | [Y]US2011295100 (HEGDE ANANT V [US], et al) [Y] 2-6, 12, 13 * ; figures 1 and 2A;-2C paragraphs [0034-0038]. *; | [XY]WO2015138915 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]) [X] 1, 7-11, 14-15 * ; figures 2 and 3; paragraphs [0029, 0032, 0034, 0064]. * [Y] 2-6, 12, 13 | by applicant | US2007060989 | US2016345782 | US2016375240 |