EP3710636 - RAILWAY SWITCH MECHANISM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A RAILWAY SWITCH MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ve'rtex Sweden AB Sävhultsvägen 40 448 95 Tollered / SE | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Bo Sävhultsvägen 40 448 95 Tollered / SE | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | Bergenstråhle Group AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18879740.1 | 14.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018SE51176 | Priority number, date | SE20170051407 | 14.11.2017 Original published format: SE 1751407 | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019098925 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3710636 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E01B7/08, E01B7/14, B61L5/02 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
E01B7/08 (EP,SE);
E01B7/14 (EP,SE,US);
B61L5/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/39] | E01B7/08, E01B7/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | EISENBAHNWEICHENMECHANISMUS UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN BETRIEB EINES EISENBAHNWEICHENMECHANISMUS | [2020/39] | English: | RAILWAY SWITCH MECHANISM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A RAILWAY SWITCH MECHANISM | [2020/39] | French: | MÉCANISME D'AIGUILLAGE DE CHEMIN DE FER ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN MÉCANISME D'AIGUILLAGE DE CHEMIN DE FER | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 03.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/03] | 01.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US792646 (BYRON JAMES H [US]) [X] 1,12,15 * figures 1-7 * * page 1, lines 68-97 * * the whole document * [I] 7-11,14; | [XI]WO8707920 (LOENNBERG TAGE [SE]) [X] 1,4,12,15 * figures 1-9 * * the whole document *[I] 7-11,14 | International search | [X]WO2016148631 (VE'RTEX SWEDEN AB [SE]) [X] 1-34 * ; abstract; page 17, line 16 - line 22; page 20, line 11 - line 18; page 31, line 29 - page 32, line 12; page 41, line 31 - page 42, line 5; page 43, line 16 - page 46, line 21; figures *; | [A]US702646 (GRISWOLD WILLIAM E [US]) [A] 1-34 * ; whole document; figures *; | [A]US591051 (MILTON MCCULLY) [A] 1-34 * ; whole document; figures *; | [A]US1399914 (JOHN ALONZO) [A] 1-34 * ; whole document; figures * |