EP3567585 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWASE, Hiro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
KAWANO, Shinichi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
TAKI, Yuhei c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
SAWAI, Kunihito c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2019/46] | Application number, filing date | 18879800.3 | 01.11.2018 | [2019/46] | WO2018JP40663 | Priority number, date | JP20170219683 | 15.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017219683 | [2019/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019098038 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3567585 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/22, G06F3/01, G06F3/16, G10L13/00, G10L15/10 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
G10L15/22 (EP,US);
G10L15/1815 (US);
G06F3/01 (EP);
G06F3/16 (EP);
G06F40/30 (US);
G06N7/01 (US);
G10L13/00 (EP);
G10L15/10 (EP);
G10L25/78 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/46] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD | [2019/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2019/46] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2019 | Translation filed | 06.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 14.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/12] | 03.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2007061152 (DOI MIWAKO [JP]) [X] 1-10,14,15 * In particular, Figures 13, 15 and 16 and corresponding passages; paragraphs 0114, 0115 * [Y] 10 [I] 11-13; | [Y]US2014214410 (JANG JUN WON [KR], et al) [Y] 10* In particular, paragraph 0114 * | International search | [Y]JP2002024212 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 10 * , [0 0 1 7], [0 0 2 3] *; | [XYA]JP2012226068 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-2, 5-6, 18-20 * , [0 0 1 2]. [0 O 3 5], [0 0 4 2] - [0 0 4 3], [0 0 4 5], [0048], [0062], [0064], [0066] - [0071], & US 2012/0271633 A1, [00081,[00701, [0077]-[0078], [0080], [0083], [0097], [0099], [0101]-[0106], [0153]-[0164], 1-5,13-14 * [Y] 3-4, 7, 10-17 [A] 8-9; | [Y]JP2016004270 (APPLE INC) [Y] 3-4, 11-12, 14, 17 * , [0 0 2 3] - [0 0 2 4], [0 0 3 2] - [0 0 3 3], [0 0 7 6], [0080], [0107], & US 2015/0348548 A1, [0028]-[0029], [0037]-[0038], [0081], [0085], [0112], 1-4 & WO 2015/183991 A1 & EP 2950307 A1 & KR 10-2015-0138109 A & CN 105320726 A *; | [Y]WO2016157658 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 13* , [0 0 6 2] & US 2018/0107445 A1, [0072] & EP 3279791 A1 & CN 107408028 A *; | [Y]JP2017156854 (KDDI CORP) [Y] 7 * , [0 0 3 6] - [0 0 3 8] * | by applicant | JPH06202689 | JP3277579B |