EP3709279 - TARGET DETECTION DEVICE FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWABATA, Suguru c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
IKENOUCHI, Takahito c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 03 /
KOYAMA, Kanichi c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 04 /
MORITANI, Takayuki c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Behr, Wolfgang, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 18880262.3 | 16.11.2018 | [2020/38] | WO2018JP42421 | Priority number, date | JP20170224670 | 22.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017224670 | [2020/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019102938 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3709279 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, G01S13/86, G01S13/93, G01S15/93, G01S17/93, B60W30/095, B60W30/12, B60W30/14, B60W40/02, G01S13/931 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
G01S13/931 (EP);
B60W30/095 (EP,US);
B60W30/12 (EP,US);
B60W30/14 (EP);
B60W40/02 (EP);
G01S13/86 (EP,US);
G01S13/93 (EP,US);
G01S15/93 (EP);
G01S17/93 (EP);
G08G1/16 (EP);
G01S2013/93185 (EP);
G01S2013/9319 (EP);
G01S2013/9321 (EP);
G01S2013/9323 (EP);
G01S2013/9324 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/38] | G08G1/16, G01S13/86, G01S13/93, G01S15/93, G01S17/93, B60W30/095, B60W30/12, B60W30/14, B60W40/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | ZIELERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2020/38] | English: | TARGET DETECTION DEVICE FOR VEHICLE | [2020/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE CIBLE DE VÉHICULE | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2020 | Translation filed | 09.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 15.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/47] | 06.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1417512 (RAYTHEON CO [US]) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0015] , [0031] , [0036] - [0042] - [0061] - [0067]; figures 2-6 * [I] 2,4,5; | [I]US2013147654 (CHOI SEUNG UN [KR], et al) [I] 1-5* paragraphs [0031] - [0039] - [0087]; figure 8 * | International search | [XA]JPH05203737 (MAZDA MOTOR) [X] 1 * , claims, paragraphs [0009]-[0010], [0016]-[0025], fig. 4-5, 9 & US 5461357 A, claims, column 2, line 6 to column 2, line 33, column 4, line 59 to column 7, line 10, fig. 4-5, 9 & DE 4302527 A1 * [A] 2-5; | [A]JP2002362396 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-5* , entire text (Family: none) *; | [XA]JP2008040603 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * , paragraphs [0013]-[0036], fig. 3 (Family: none) * [A] 2-5 | by applicant | JP2009058316 |