EP3667772 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE SLURRY COMPOSITION FOR SECONDARY BATTERY, AND POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR SECONDARY BATTERY AND SECONDARY BATTERY WHICH ARE PREPARED BY USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/25] | CATHODE SLURRY COMPOSITION FOR SECONDARY BATTERY, AND CATHODE FOR SECONDARY BATTERY AND SECONDARY BATTERY PRODUCED BY USING SAME | ||
[2021/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states LG Energy Solution Ltd. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07335 Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOO, Jung Woo LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
SHIM, Hye Lim LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
LIM, Jun Muk LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18880311.8 | 23.11.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018KR14526 | Priority number, date | KR20170158628 | 24.11.2017 Original published format: KR 20170158628 | KR20170158629 | 24.11.2017 Original published format: KR 20170158629 | [2020/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019103526 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3667772 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3667772 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/13, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, H01M4/04, H01M4/139, // H01M4/02 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
H01M4/622 (EP,KR);
H01M4/13 (EP,KR);
H01M10/4235 (US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR);
H01M4/0404 (EP);
H01M4/139 (EP);
H01M4/62 (EP,KR);
H01M4/625 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2004/028 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | H01M4/13, H01M4/62, H01M10/052 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIVE ELEKTRODENAUFSCHLÄMMUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR EINE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND POSITIVE ELEKTRODE FÜR EINE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE WELCHE DURCH VERWENDUNG DERSELBEN HERGESTELLT WIRD | [2021/31] | English: | POSITIVE ELECTRODE SLURRY COMPOSITION FOR SECONDARY BATTERY, AND POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR SECONDARY BATTERY AND SECONDARY BATTERY WHICH ARE PREPARED BY USING THE SAME | [2021/31] | French: | COMPOSITION DE BOUILLIE D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE, ET ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE FABRIQUÉE EN UTILISANT LA MÊME | [2021/31] |
Former [2020/25] | KATHODENAUFSCHLÄMMUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR EINE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND KATHODE FÜR EINE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | ||
Former [2020/25] | CATHODE SLURRY COMPOSITION FOR SECONDARY BATTERY, AND CATHODE FOR SECONDARY BATTERY AND SECONDARY BATTERY PRODUCED BY USING SAME | ||
Former [2020/25] | COMPOSITION DE BOUILLIE DE CATHODE POUR ACCUMULATEUR, ET CATHODE POUR ACCUMULATEUR ET ACCUMULATEUR PRODUITS À L'AIDE DE CELLE-CI | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2020 | Translation filed | 12.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 02.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2018 | AL | 13.10.2021 | AT | 13.10.2021 | CY | 13.10.2021 | CZ | 13.10.2021 | DK | 13.10.2021 | EE | 13.10.2021 | ES | 13.10.2021 | FI | 13.10.2021 | HR | 13.10.2021 | IT | 13.10.2021 | LT | 13.10.2021 | LV | 13.10.2021 | MC | 13.10.2021 | MK | 13.10.2021 | NL | 13.10.2021 | RO | 13.10.2021 | RS | 13.10.2021 | SE | 13.10.2021 | SI | 13.10.2021 | SK | 13.10.2021 | SM | 13.10.2021 | IE | 23.11.2021 | LU | 23.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | BG | 13.01.2022 | NO | 13.01.2022 | GR | 14.01.2022 | IS | 13.02.2022 | PT | 14.02.2022 | CH | 01.07.2022 | LI | 01.07.2022 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/35] | HU | 23.11.2018 | |
AL | 13.10.2021 | ||
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
CH | 01.07.2022 | ||
LI | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 23.11.2018 | |
AL | 13.10.2021 | ||
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 13.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2017010093 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]KR20170049459 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]KR20170111749 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1-14 * experimental examples 1,2; paragraphs [0010] , [0024] , [0029] , [0030] , [0032] , [0035] - [0038] - [0041] , [0043] - [0047] - [0052] , [0080] - [0084] - [0160]; examples 1-3 *; | [XP]US2018198126 (FUKUMINE MAYUMI [JP], et al) [XP] 1-14 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0107]; examples 1-4,6; claims 1-4,9 *; | [XP]US2018198129 (KIM YE LIN [KR], et al) [XP] 1-14* paragraphs [0002] , [0009] , [0084]; claims 5,10 * | International search | [A]KR20150016852 [A] 1-15 * 1-5, 7, 12, 13; [0035]-[0045], [0063], [0068] *; | [Y]KR20170049459 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * 1, 5, 8-12, 14, 15; [0054], [0119], [0123], [0125], [0169], [0172], [0175], [0181], [0183], [0190], [0196], [0251], [0252], [0254]-[0256] ; 4, 6 . *; | [Y]KR20170113212 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 9 * 1, 4-9, 14, 15; [0046], [0065], [0074], [0076], [0077], [0084], [0087], [0091]-[0097], [0099], [0117], [0118], [0120], [0125], [0127], [0128], [0130], [0176], [0205], [0206]; 2, 3 *; | [A]KR20170111749 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* 1, 5-12; [0199], [0200]; *; | [Y]KR20170117194 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * 1, 7, 10, 11; [0046], [0049], [0051], [0053]-[0055], [0096], [0106], [0108], [0114], [0126], [0148], [0149], [0174] * | by applicant | JP2013206598 |