EP3716482 - DIGITAL NOISE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASANO, Megumu c/o Intellectual Property Center OMRON CORPORATION 9-chome, 1, Kizugawa-shi Kyoto, 619-0283 / JP | 02 /
KUBO, Kimikazu c/o Intellectual Property Center OMRON CORPORATION 9-chome, 1, Kizugawa-shi Shimogyo-ku Kyoto, 619-0283 / JP | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/40] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18881618.5 | 25.10.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018JP39751 | Priority number, date | JP20170226071 | 24.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017226071 | [2020/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019102785 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3716482 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H03K5/1252, H03H17/00, H03H17/02 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
H03K5/1252 (EP,US);
H03H17/00 (US);
H03H17/02 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/40] | H03K5/1252, H03H17/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Title | German: | DIGITALER RAUSCHFILTER | [2020/40] | English: | DIGITAL NOISE FILTER | [2020/40] | French: | FILTRE DE BRUIT NUMÉRIQUE | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2020 | Translation filed | 04.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 15.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/30] | 08.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60137117 (NIPPON DENKI HOME ELECTRONICS) [X] 1-3* the whole document *; | [X]JP2009217539 (KOYO ELECTRONICS IND CO) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS56138330 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-3* , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS6236925 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [XY]JPH03218114 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-2 * , page 1, lower right column, line 1 to page 4, upper left column, line 16, fig. 3 (Family: none) * [Y] 3; | [Y]JP2016063406 (DENSO WAVE INC) [Y] 3 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0007], [0032]-[0041], fig. 1-2 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH1070444 |