EP3714672 - HARVESTING MACHINE, TRAVEL DISTANCE LIMIT CALCULATION PROGRAM, RECORDING MEDIUM HAVING TRAVEL DISTANCE LIMIT CALCULATION PROGRAM RECORDED THEREON, TRAVEL DISTANCE LIMIT CALCULATION METHOD, AGRICULTURAL WORK VEHICLE, TURNING CONTROL PROGRAM, RECORDING MEDIUM HAVING TURNING CONTROL PROGRAM RECORDED THEREON, TURNING CONTROL METHOD, COMBINE CONTROL SYSTEM, COMBINE CONTROL PROGRAM, RECORDING MEDIUM HAVING COMBINE CONTROL PROGRAM RECORDED THEREON, AND COMBINE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kubota Corporation 2-47, Shikitsuhigashi 1-chome Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-8601 / JP | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAGUCHI, Kazuo c/o Kubota Corporation Hanshin Office 1-1 Hama 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-0967 / JP | 02 /
SANO, Tomohiko c/o Kubota Corporation Hanshin Office 1-1 Hama 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-0967 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIDA, Osamu c/o Kubota Corporation Hanshin Office 1-1 Hama 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-0967 / JP | 04 /
MARUO, Satoshi c/o Kubota Corporation Hanshin Office 1-1 Hama 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-0967 / JP | 05 /
NAKABAYASHI, Takashi c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho 64 Ishizukitamachi Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-0823 / JP | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 18881792.8 | 22.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018JP43142 | Priority number, date | JP20170225544 | 24.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017225544 | JP20170225545 | 24.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017225545 | JP20170245498 | 21.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017245498 | [2020/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019103089 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3714672 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/127 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
A01D41/1272 (EP,US);
A01D41/1275 (KR,US);
B60K31/00 (US);
A01D41/1208 (EP,KR,US);
A01D41/1217 (US);
A01D41/1278 (US);
A01D41/127 (EP);
A01F12/60 (US);
B60Y2200/222 (KR,US);
B60Y2300/02 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Title | German: | ERNTEMASCHINE, FAHRWEGBEGRENZUNGSBERECHNUNGSPROGRAMM, AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM MIT DARAUF AUFGEZEICHNETEM FAHRWEGBEGRENZUNGSBERECHNUNGSPROGRAMM, FAHRWEGBEGRENZUNGSBERECHNUNGSVERFAHREN, LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHES ARBEITSFAHRZEUG, WENDESTEUERPROGRAMM, AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM MIT DARAUF AUFGEZEICHNETEM WENDESTEUERPROGRAMM, WENDESTEUERVERFAHREN, MÄHDRESCHERSTEUERSYSTEM, MÄHDRESCHERSTEUERPROGRAMM, AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM MIT DARAUF AUFGEZEICHNETEM MÄHDRESCHERSTEUERPROGRAMM UND MÄHDRESCHERSTEUERVERFAHREN | [2020/40] | English: | HARVESTING MACHINE, TRAVEL DISTANCE LIMIT CALCULATION PROGRAM, RECORDING MEDIUM HAVING TRAVEL DISTANCE LIMIT CALCULATION PROGRAM RECORDED THEREON, TRAVEL DISTANCE LIMIT CALCULATION METHOD, AGRICULTURAL WORK VEHICLE, TURNING CONTROL PROGRAM, RECORDING MEDIUM HAVING TURNING CONTROL PROGRAM RECORDED THEREON, TURNING CONTROL METHOD, COMBINE CONTROL SYSTEM, COMBINE CONTROL PROGRAM, RECORDING MEDIUM HAVING COMBINE CONTROL PROGRAM RECORDED THEREON, AND COMBINE CONTROL METHOD | [2020/40] | French: | MACHINE DE RÉCOLTE, PROGRAMME DE CALCUL DE LIMITE DE DISTANCE DE DÉPLACEMENT, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT SUR LEQUEL EST ENREGISTRÉ UN PROGRAMME DE CALCUL DE LIMITE DE DISTANCE DE DÉPLACEMENT, PROCÉDÉ DE CALCUL DE LIMITE DE DISTANCE DE DÉPLACEMENT, VÉHICULE DE TRAVAIL AGRICOLE, PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE DE ROTATION, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT SUR LEQUEL EST ENREGISTRÉ UN PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE DE ROTATION, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE ROTATION, SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE MOISSONNEUSE-BATTEUSE, PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE DE MOISSONNEUSE-BATTEUSE, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT SUR LEQUEL EST ENREGISTRÉ UN PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE DE MOISSONNEUSE-BATTEUSE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE MOISSONNEUSE-BATTEUSE | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2020 | Translation filed | 14.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 27.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2015181371 (YANMAR CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0007] , [0014] , [0024] - [0043] *; | [A]JP2017195804 (YANMAR CO LTD) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0002] , [0009] , [0043] , [0074] , [0075] * | International search | [A]JP2006254725 (YANMAR CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0046]-[0049], fig. 13 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP4887577B (ISEKI & CO., LTD.) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0033]-[0043], fig. 8 (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2014177764 (YANMAR CO LTD) [Y] 1, 4-6 * , paragraphs [0016]-[0021], [0053]-[0054], fig. 1-3, 6 (Family: none) * [A] 2-3; | [YA]JP2015198577 (YANMAR CO LTD) [Y] 1, 4-6 * , paragraphs [0038]-[0045], [0088]-[0113], fig. 3, 7, 9-13 & WO 2015/152362 A1 & CN 106163260 A & KR 10-2016-0140729 A * [A] 2-3; | [A]US2015377690 (PHELAN JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 1-6* , paragraphs [0033]-[0041], fig. 2-3 & EP 2960634 A1 & CN 105210541 A & AU 2015203446 A & BR 102015015315 A * | by applicant | JP2001069836 |